Reports for CEREARAS AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout CEREARAS AG
- CEREARAS AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Kloten. CEREARAS AG belongs to the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is currently active.
- There is one active person registered in the management.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 03.09.2024.
- CEREARAS AG is registered in the Canton of ZH under the UID CHE-102.223.899.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.04.2001
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Kloten
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.024.473-1
UID/VAT
CHE-102.223.899
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Bewirtschaftung von Immobilien; kann sich ausserdem an Hotelanlagen beteiligen sowie das Management von Hotels führen und ferner Handel aller Art betreiben; kann Mobilien, Konzessionen und Rechte aller Art erwerben und veräussern; kann Grundstücke erwerben, halten und veräussern. Die Gesellschaft kann sich an gleichartigen oder ähnlichen Unternehmen beteiligen. Sie kann Geschäftsstellen und Vertretungen im In- und Ausland sowie Tochtergesellschaften und Zweigniederlassungen im Inland errichten. Die Gesellschaft kann Darlehen, Garantien und andere Arten der Finanzierung und von Sicherheitsleistungen für Konzerngesellschaften, Aktionäre und Dritte gewähren und die Interessen von Konzerngesellschaften fördern.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Treuhand- und Revisionsgesellschaft Mattig-Suter und Partner | Schwyz | 06.01.2014 | 02.09.2024 | |
Retraco AG | Schwyz | <2004 | 05.01.2014 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- CEREARAS SA
- CEREARAS Ltd.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: CEREARAS AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006119996, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
CEREARAS AG, bisher in Gersau, CHE-102.223.899, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 117 vom 19.06.2024, Publ. 1006060947).
Statutenänderung:
22.08.2024.
Sitz neu:
Kloten.
Domizil neu:
Alte Landstrasse 50, 8302 Kloten.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen schriftlich oder per E-Mail an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen. Gemäss Erklärung vom 22.08.2024 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Treuhand- und Revisionsgesellschaft Mattig-Suter und Partner (CHE-102.292.601), in Schwyz, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1006120329, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
CEREARAS AG, in Gersau, CHE-102.223.899, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 117 vom 19.06.2024, Publ. 1006060947). Die Rechtseinheit wird infolge Verlegung des Sitzes nach Kloten im Handelsregister des Kantons Schwyz von Amtes wegen gelöscht.
Publication number: HR02-1006060947, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
CEREARAS AG, in Gersau, CHE-102.223.899, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 4 vom 08.01.2024, Publ. 1005927381).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Stump, Henrik, von Wattwil, in Kilchberg (ZH), Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stump Pecoraro, Tamiko Pascale, von Wattwil, in Kloten, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsidentin, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.