Address
Avenue des Comtes de Savoie 76
1913 Saillon
Reports for Centurie Technology SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Centurie Technology SA
- Centurie Technology SA in Saillon is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Trading with various goods». Centurie Technology SA is active.
- The management consists of one person. The company was founded on 20.12.2019.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 31.07.2024.
- The company's UID is CHE-489.588.726.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
20.12.2019
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Saillon
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-621.3.009.602-9
UID/VAT
CHE-489.588.726
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Commercialisation de produits sanitaires, biologiques, agricoles et phytosanitaires en Suisse, en Europe et dans le monde ainsi que toute activité financière et/ou immobilière en relation (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Centurie Technology SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006098222, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Centurie Technology SA, à Saillon, CHE-489.588.726, société anonyme (No. FOSC 254 du 29.12.2021, Publ. 1005370861).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Bourdin, Pierre, citoyen français, à Saillon, membre et secrétaire du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle;
Maury, Monique, citoyenne française, à Saillon, administratrice, avec signature collective à deux avec le secrétaire.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Seppey, Jean Pierre, de Hérémence, à Saillon, administrateur unique, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: président du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle].
Publication number: HR02-1005370861, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Centurie Technology SA, à Saillon, CHE-489.588.726, société anonyme (No. FOSC 250 du 27.12.2019, Publ. 1004794305).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Seppey, Jean Pierre, de Hérémence, à Saillon, président du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: président du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux avec le secrétaire];
Bourdin, Pierre, citoyen français, à Saillon, membre et secrétaire du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: à Leytron];
Maury, Monique, citoyenne française, à Saillon, administratrice, avec signature collective à deux avec le secrétaire [précédemment: à Leytron].
Publication number: HR01-1004794305, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Centurie Technology SA, à Saillon, CHE-489.588.726, Avenue des Comtes de Savoie 76, 1913 Saillon, société anonyme (Nouvelle inscription).
Date des statuts:
16.12.2019.
But:
commercialisation de produits sanitaires, biologiques, agricoles et phytosanitaires en Suisse, en Europe et dans le monde ainsi que toute activité financière et/ou immobilière en relation (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Capital-actions:
CHF 100'000.00.
Capital-actions libéré:
CHF 100'000.00.
Actions:
100 actions nominatives de CHF 1'000.00 avec restriction de transmissibilité selon statuts.
Organe de publication:
FOSC.
Communications aux actionnaires:
par écrit pour les convocations aux assemblées générales et par écrit, par fax ou par courrier électronique pour les autres communications. Selon déclaration du 16.12.2019, il est renoncé à un contrôle restreint.
Personne(s) inscrite(s):
Seppey, Jean Pierre, de Hérémence, à Saillon, président du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux avec le secrétaire;
Bourdin, Pierre, citoyen français, à Leytron, membre et secrétaire du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle;
Maury, Monique, citoyenne française, à Leytron, administratrice, avec signature collective à deux avec le secrétaire.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.