Address
c/o Stéphane Cook
Route des Dailles 32
1752 Villars-sur-Glâne
Reports for Center for European Research Initiatives in Cardiovascular Medicine Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Center for European Research Initiatives in Cardiovascular Medicine Sàrl
- Center for European Research Initiatives in Cardiovascular Medicine Sàrl has its legal headquarters in Villars-sur-Glâne and is active. It operates in the sector «Research and development».
- Center for European Research Initiatives in Cardiovascular Medicine Sàrl was founded on 19.12.2013.
- On the 31.08.2023 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- In the commercial register the company Center for European Research Initiatives in Cardiovascular Medicine Sàrl is registered under the UID CHE-389.008.921.
Management (4)
Executive board
Dragica Paunovic,
Pieter Cornelis Smits,
Stéphane Pierre Cook
newest authorized signatories
Dragica Paunovic,
Pieter Cornelis Smits,
Stéphane Pierre Cook,
Asmah Amrani
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.12.2013
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Villars-sur-Glâne
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-660.3.401.013-1
UID/VAT
CHE-389.008.921
Sector
Research and development
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Toute activité de recherche médicale dans le domaine cardiovasculaire, dont en particulier la gestion d'études cliniques en Suisse et à l'étranger; la société pourra en outre effectuer toutes les opérations qui se rapportent directement ou indirectement à son but social et qui favorisent ou facilitent son développement; la société ne poursuit aucun but lucratif.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Center for European Research Initiatives in Cardiovascular Medicine Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005827723, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Center for European Research Initiatives in Cardiovascular Medicine Sàrl, à Villars-sur-Glâne, CHE-389.008.921 (FOSC du 24.02.2022, p. 0/1005413498).
Personnes radiées:
Chevalier Bernard, associé, 13 parts de CHF 500, gérant, signature individuelle;
Poisson usage Morice Marie-Claude, associée, 13 parts de CHF 500, gérante, signature collective à deux.
Nouvelles personnes inscrites:
Paunovic Dragica, de Serbie, à Bruxelles (BE), associée, 13 parts de CHF 500, gérante, signature individuelle;
Smits Pieter Cornelis, de Pays-Bas, à Rotterdam (NL), associé, 13 parts de CHF 500, gérant, signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005414100, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Center for European Research Initiatives in Cardiovascular Medicine Sàrl, à Genève, CHE-389.008.921 (FOSC du 17.08.2020, p. 0/1004959302). Par suite du transfert de son siège à Villars-sur-Glâne, la société est inscrite au registre du commerce du canton de Fribourg;
par conséquent, elle est radiée d'office du registre de Genève.
Publication number: HR02-1005413498, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Center for European Research Initiatives in Cardiovascular Medicine Sàrl, précédemment à Genève, CHE-389.008.921 (FOSC du 17.08.2020, p. 0/1004959302). Siège transféré à Villars-sur-Glâne.
Nouvelle adresse:
Route des Dailles 2, c/o Stéphane Cook, 1752 Villars-sur-Glâne. Statuts modifiés le 04.02.2022.
Personne radiée:
Urban Philippe, associé, 7 parts de CHF 500, gérant président, signature collective à deux.
Personnes inscrites modifiées:
Cook Stéphane, associé, 7 parts de CHF 500, gérant, signature collective à deux, maintenant, associé, 14 parts de CHF 500, gérant président, signature individuelle;
Chevalier Bernard, associé, gérant, signature collective à deux maintenant associé, gérant, signature individuelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.