Reports for Cemcoach GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Cemcoach GmbH
- Cemcoach GmbH with its legal headquarters in Hünenberg See is active. Cemcoach GmbH operates in the sector «Other Business-to-Business services».
- The management has one active person registered.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 16.11.2018.
- The reported UID is CHE-113.793.882.
- On the same address as Cemcoach GmbH there are 24 other active companies registered. These include: AVT Anlage, Verwaltung & Technologie GmbH, BBLUM GMBH, BUTTERFLY events & more GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
31.08.2007
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Hünenberg
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-170.4.007.440-5
UID/VAT
CHE-113.793.882
Sector
Other Business-to-Business services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erbringung von Dienstleistungen im Bereich Persönlichkeitsentwicklung, Coaching, Gesundheitsberatung, Schulungen, Personalschulungen und Unternehmensberatung sowie Handel mit Kosmetikprodukten aller und Kunstgegenständen aller Art; vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Cemcoach GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004499398, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Cemcoach GmbH, in Hünenberg, CHE-113.793.882, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 188 vom 28.09.2011, Publ. 6353226).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Nagel, Marc, von Arth, in Hünenberg See, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, Gesellschafter, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Zeyer, Terence Gonzague, französischer Staatsangehöriger, in Dübendorf, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Publication number: 6353226, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Cemcoach GmbH, in Hünenberg, CH-170.4.007.440-5, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 183 vom 22.09.2009, S. 20, Publ. 5257834).
Statutenänderung:
09.09.2011.
Zweck neu:
Erbringung von Dienstleistungen im Bereich Persönlichkeitsentwicklung, Coaching, Gesundheitsberatung, Schulungen, Personalschulungen und Unternehmensberatung sowie Handel mit Kosmetikprodukten aller und Kunstgegenständen aller Art;
vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Tschopp-Wolleb, Esther, von Ziefen, in Rupperswil, Vorsitzende der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift und Gesellschafterin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Tschopp, Richard, von Ziefen, in Rupperswil, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Nagel, Marc, von Arth, in Hünenberg See, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift und Gesellschafter, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Publication number: 5257834, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Cemcoach GmbH, in Hünenberg, CH-170.4.007.440-5, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 119 vom 24.06.2009, S. 35, Publ. 5086986).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Tschopp-Wolleb, Esther, von Ziefen, in Rupperswil, Vorsitzende der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift und Gesellschafterin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Gesellschafterin mit Einzelunterschrift und mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00];
Tschopp, Richard, von Ziefen, in Rupperswil, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Geschäftsführer mit Einzelunterschrift und Gesellschafter mit Einzelunterschrift und mit 190 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.