Reports for CCC Country Club Conception AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout CCC Country Club Conception AG
- CCC Country Club Conception AG has its legal headquarters in Erlen and is active. It operates in the sector «Sport services».
- The management of the company CCC Country Club Conception AG consists of 6 persons.
- On the 16.08.2019 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register TG under the UID CHE-100.137.817.
- On the same address as CCC Country Club Conception AG there are 3 other active companies registered. These include: Golfclub Erlen, pcg ag, PEPA Gastronomie GmbH.
Management (6)
newest board members
Guido Goldinger,
Andreas Fischer,
Guido Baumgärtner,
Hans Eduard Mäder-Gmür,
Dominik Michael Kumschick
newest authorized signatories
Philipp Schödler,
Guido Goldinger,
Andreas Fischer,
Guido Baumgärtner,
Hans Eduard Mäder-Gmür
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
12.03.1985
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Erlen
Commercial Registry Office
TG
Commercial register number
CH-440.3.004.851-6
UID/VAT
CHE-100.137.817
Sector
Sport services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Unterhalt und Bewirtschaftung der Golfplatzanlage mit Clubhaus und Restaurationsbetrieb auf dem Golfplatzgelände "Schlossgut Eppishausen" in der Gemeinde Erlen. Die Gesellschaft kann zu diesem Zweck alle kommerziellen, finanziellen und anderen Tätigkeiten ausüben, welche mit dem Gesellschaftszweck im Zusammenhang stehen; sie kann insbesondere Grundstücke erwerben, halten und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Thalmann Treuhand AG | Weinfelden | 14.04.2000 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: CCC Country Club Conception AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004697513, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
CCC Country Club Conception AG, in Erlen, CHE-100.137.817, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 96 vom 22.05.2018, Publ. 4240671).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bossart, Petra, von Oberbüren, in Wil SG, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schödler, Philipp, von Villigen, in Uetliburg SG (Gommiswald), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 4240671, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
CCC Country Club Conception AG, in Erlen, CHE-100.137.817, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 83 vom 01.05.2018, Publ. 4204787).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Heller, Christian, von Truttikon, in Erlen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 4204787, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
CCC Country Club Conception AG, in Erlen, CHE-100.137.817, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 177 vom 14.09.2015, Publ. 2371767).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Signer, Lorenz, von Appenzell, in Erlen, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hansmann, Doris, von Oberegg und Wildhaus-Alt St. Johann, in Mörschwil, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Sutter, Ulrich, von Appenzell, in Bronschhofen (Wil (SG)), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Tanner, Markus, von Appenzell, in Weinfelden, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Vonplon, Christoph, von Vilters-Wangs, in Sitterdorf (Zihlschlacht-Sitterdorf), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Goldinger, Guido, von Herdern und Homburg, in Weinfelden, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Baumgärtner, Guido, von Boswil, in Berg TG, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Fischer, Andreas, von Signau, in Erlen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Mäder, Hans, von Kirchberg (SG), in Eschlikon TG (Eschlikon), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Bossart, Petra, von Oberbüren, in Wil SG, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.