Reports for CC-Carbon Credits GmbH in Liquidation
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout CC-Carbon Credits GmbH in Liquidation
- CC-Carbon Credits GmbH in Liquidation is a Limited liability company with its legal headquarters in Bern. CC-Carbon Credits GmbH in Liquidation belongs to the industry «Other freelance work» and is currently in liquidation.
- The company was founded on 15.12.2008.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 03.11.2023. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- CC-Carbon Credits GmbH in Liquidation is registered in the Canton of BE under the UID CHE-114.633.689.
- On the same address as CC-Carbon Credits GmbH in Liquidation there are 8 other active companies registered. These include: cloudtec AG, Corifeo Treuhand GmbH, David Jähnich Maler-Dave.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
15.12.2008
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Bern
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-140.4.003.185-4
UID/VAT
CHE-114.633.689
Sector
Other freelance work
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Beratung sowie Prüfung von Information, die Validierung, Verifizierung, Analyse, Bewertung und Due-Diligence-Prüfung von Projekten, Unternehmen, Anlagen, Berichten und Entwicklungen im Bereich Nachhaltigkeit, und zwar nach angewandt wissenschaftlichen Prinzipien. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- CC-Carbon Credits GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: CC-Carbon Credits GmbH in Liquidation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005875983, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
CC-Carbon Credits GmbH in Liquidation, in Bern, CHE-114.633.689, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 119 vom 22.06.2023, Publ. 1005774995).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Stankiewitz, Oliver, von Schwarzenburg, in Oberbalm, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: LS02-0000058971, Commercial Registry Office Berne
Rubrik: Liquidationsschuldenrufe Unterrubrik: Liquidationsschuldenruf einer Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Publikationsdatum: SHAB 03.07.2023 Voraussichtliches Ablaufdatum: 03.07.2028 Meldungsnummer: Publizierende Stelle Jürg Wisler - Notariat Wisler, Belpbergstrasse 5a, 3110 Münsingen Liquidationsschuldenruf CC-Carbon Credits GmbH in Liquidation Organisation in Auflösung: CC-Carbon Credits GmbH in Liquidation CHE-114.633.689 Sandrainstrasse 17
Kontaktstelle: Jürg Wisler - Notariat Wisler, Belpbergstrasse 5a, P.O.B. 1308, 3110 Münsingen,
Publication number: HR02-1005774995, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
CC-Carbon Credits GmbH, in Bern, CHE-114.633.689, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 31 vom 15.02.2016, Publ. 2666275).
Firma neu:
CC-Carbon Credits GmbH in Liquidation. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Gesellschafterversammlung vom 05.06.2023 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Leonardi, Silvio Dr., von Bedretto, in Bern, Geschäftsführer, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Köniz, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.