Reports for Casino Zürichsee AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Casino Zürichsee AG
- Casino Zürichsee AG has its legal headquarters in Pfäffikon SZ and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Gambling, betting, lotteries».
- The management of the company Casino Zürichsee AG, which was founded on the 13.11.1996, consists of 7 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 02.05.2024.
- Casino Zürichsee AG is registered in the Canton of SZ under the UID CHE-108.748.344.
- Colibri Solutions GmbH, COSYWORLD AG, DeepTech Ventures AG are registered at the same address.
Management (7)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Peter Paul Oesch,
Marcel Rudolf Tobler,
Semra Seker,
Michael Bolliger,
Patrick Mastai
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.11.1996
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Freienbach
Commercial Registry Office
SZ
Commercial register number
CH-130.0.008.497-2
UID/VAT
CHE-108.748.344
CHE-116.313.072 VAT
Sector
Gambling, betting, lotteries
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Betrieb eines terrestrischen Spielcasinos (samt Annexangeboten) sowie eines Online-Spielcasinos. Die Gesellschaft kann, als Teil der Swiss-Casinos-Gruppe, den Gesellschaften dieser Gruppe Darlehen oder andere Finanzierungen aller Art gewähren und für Verbindlichkeiten der Gruppengesellschaften Sicherheiten aller Art stellen, insbesondere in Form von Garantien, Pfändern, Globalzessionen, Sicherungsübereignungen, Sicherungsabtretungen und Schadloshaltungserklärungen, ob entgeltlich oder nicht. Die Gesellschaft darf zu diesem Zweck im Interesse der Swiss-Casinos-Gruppe oder einzelner Gruppengesellschaften handeln. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Gesellschaften im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
KPMG AG | Zürich | 01.06.2017 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Zürich | 31.05.2006 | 31.05.2017 | |
BDO Sofirom SA | Zürich | <2004 | 30.05.2006 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- SEEDAMM CASINO AG
- CB Casino Brunnen AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Casino Zürichsee AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006023270, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Casino Zürichsee AG, in Freienbach, CHE-108.748.344, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 46 vom 06.03.2024, Publ. 1005978632).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Baumann, Marc, von Zürich, in Zürich, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Meyer, Stefan, von Zürich, in Volketswil, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Tobler, Marcel Rudolf, von Zumikon, in Wettingen, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Oesch, Peter Paul, von Balgach, in Birmensdorf (ZH), Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005978632, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Casino Zürichsee AG, in Freienbach, CHE-108.748.344, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 3 vom 05.01.2024, Publ. 1005925979).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Seker, Semra, von Suhr, in Suhr, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005925979, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Casino Zürichsee AG, in Freienbach, CHE-108.748.344, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 77 vom 21.04.2023, Publ. 1005729126).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hühn, Dennis, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Lachen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Oesch, Peter Paul, von Balgach, in Birmensdorf (ZH), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Tobler, Marcel Rudolf, von Zumikon, in Wettingen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.