Address
Untere Schwandenstrasse 71
8805 Richterswil
Reports for Carrosserie Rusterholz AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Carrosserie Rusterholz AG
- Carrosserie Rusterholz AG with its legal headquarters in Richterswil is active. Carrosserie Rusterholz AG operates in the sector «Dealing and repair of automobiles and motorcycles».
- The company was founded on 18.11.1976 and has 4 persons in its management.
- On the 29.10.2021 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- Carrosserie Rusterholz AG is registered in the Canton of ZH under the UID CHE-101.881.321.
Management (4)
newest board members
Martin Rusterholz,
Karl Rusterholz jun.,
Christian Rusterholz
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Brigitte Stehrenberger,
Martin Rusterholz,
Karl Rusterholz jun.,
Christian Rusterholz
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.11.1976
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Richterswil
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.904.866-1
UID/VAT
CHE-101.881.321
Sector
Dealing and repair of automobiles and motorcycles
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt: a) Die Konstruktion von neuen Carrosserien und Fahrzeugen. b) Die Ausführung von Carrosserie- und Fahrzeugreparaturen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen und Grundstücke erwerben, halten und veräussern. Daneben kann die Gesellschaft alle Geschäfte durchführen, die direkt oder indirekt im Zusammenhang mit dem Gesellschaftszweck stehen oder dessen Erfüllung fördern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
OBT AG | Zürich | 03.12.2001 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Carrosserie Rusterholz AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005322597, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Carrosserie Rusterholz AG, in Richterswil, CHE-101.881.321, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 168 vom 30.08.2012, S.0, Publ. 6828190).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rusterholz, Karl jun., von Wädenswil, in Wädenswil, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Richterswil];
Stehrenberger, Brigitte, von Bussnang, in Horgen, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Thalwil].
Publication number: 6828190, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Carrosserie Rusterholz AG, in Richterswil, CH-020.3.904.866-1, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 93 vom 14.05.2012, Publ. 6677528).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Rusterholz, Max, von Wädenswil, in Hirzel, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 6677528, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Carrosserie Rusterholz AG, in Richterswil, CH-020.3.904.866-1, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 89 vom 10.05.2010, S. 28, Publ. 5625246).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stehrenberger, Brigitte, von Bussnang, in Thalwil, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.