Reports for Carey AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Carey AG
- Carey AG has its legal headquarters in Zürich and is active. It operates in the sector «Fund management».
- Carey AG has 12 persons entered in its management.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 26.09.2024.
- The company Carey AG is registered under the UID CHE-110.105.581.
Management (12)
newest board members
Dr. Ariel Sergio Davidoff,
Thomas Emanuel Meier,
Beat Hans Häring,
Simon Richard Cole
newest authorized signatories
Dorila Maria Piar,
Maria Laura Ferrer Agnone,
Sylvia De Carvalho Ferreira Piton,
Martin Eros Elzi,
Simon Peter Bernet
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
25.06.2003
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.026.847-6
UID/VAT
CHE-110.105.581
Sector
Fund management
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt in erster Linie die Erbringung von Trustee-Dienstleistungen im Sinne des FINIG, die Verwaltung von Treuhandvermögen und die Durchführung von Treuhandgeschäften. Die Gesellschaft kann alle mit Ihrem Zweck oder der Anlage ihrer Mittel direkt oder indirekt in Verbindung stehenden Geschäften vornehmen, ihre Tätigkeit auf andere Branchen ausdehnen, Grundstücke erwerben, veräussern oder verwalten. Die Gesellschaft kann den Erwerb, die Finanzierung und Verwaltung von Beteiligungen an anderen Unternehmungen sowie die Abwicklung der damit zusammenhängenden Finanzgeschäften und Dienstleistungen vornehmen. Die Gesellschaft kann Lizenzrechte oder Patente erwerben, verwerten oder damit Handel betreiben. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften in der Schweiz und im Ausland errichten und sich an anderen oder ähnlichen Unternehmen in der Schweiz und im Ausland beteiligen oder solche erwerben, Vertretungen auf eigenen oder fremden Namen übernehmen, sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fides Experta AG | Zürich | 11.12.2017 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Deloitte AG | Zürich | 16.11.2009 | 10.12.2017 | |
Grant Thornton Wirtschaftsprüfung AG | Zürich | 06.11.2008 | 15.11.2009 | |
Fidinter AG | Zürich | <2004 | 05.11.2008 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Carey SA
- Carey Ltd
- Carey Olsen AG
- Carey Langlois AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Carey AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006138363, Commercial Registry Office Zurich
Carey AG, in Zürich, CHE-110.105.581, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 136 vom 16.07.2024, Publ. 1006085163).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Delgado-Bauhofer, Piedad Lucia , von Wollerau, in Wollerau, Vizedirektorin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Muntwyler, Jean Claude, von Zürich, in Küssnacht (SZ), Vizedirektor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1006085163, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Carey AG, in Zürich, CHE-110.105.581, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 26 vom 07.02.2024, Publ. 1005954495).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
De Carvalho Ferreira Piton, Sylvia, italienische Staatsangehörige, in Herrliberg, Vizedirektorin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Ferrer Agnone, Maria Laura, spanische Staatsangehörige, in Küsnacht (ZH), Vizedirektorin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Piar, Dorila Maria, niederländische Staatsangehörige, in Meilen, Vizedirektorin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005954495, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Carey AG, in Zürich, CHE-110.105.581, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 224 vom 17.11.2022, Publ. 1005606184).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bernet, Simon Peter, von Grindelwald, in Würenlos, Vizedirektor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Elzi, Martin Eros, von Bosco/Gurin, in Obfelden, Vizedirektor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.