Reports for CAP Immobilier SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout CAP Immobilier SA
- CAP Immobilier SA is active in the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Avry-sur-Matran.
- There is one active person registered in the management.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 08.07.2019.
- The reported UID is CHE-222.838.403.
- Companies with the same address as CAP Immobilier SA: Sepaco Trading SA, Swimmob SA.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
04.01.2011
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Avry
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.3.546.426-2
UID/VAT
CHE-222.838.403
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Toutes opérations commerciales et financières se rapportant aux affaires immobilières notamment achat, vente, courtage, expertise, gestion d'entreprise générale et mise en valeur d'immeubles; gérance d'immeubles; exploitation d'un bureau d'architecture; réaliser tous plans, projets et plans financiers pour l'exécution de travaux de construction; exécuter ou faire exécuter et surveiller tous travaux de construction; effectuer du travail d'entreprise générale totale (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: CAP Immobilier SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004670124, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
CAP Immobilier SA, à Avry, CHE-222.838.403 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225826).
Personne radiée:
Breney Pierre, administrateur président, signature individuelle.
Personne inscrite modifiée:
Schwab Patrick, administrateur secrétaire, signature individuelle, nom précis Schwab Patrick Jean Pierre, maintenant originaire de Villorsonnens, désormais administrateur, signature individuelle.
Publication number: 5978402, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
CAP Immobilier SA, à Avry, Avry-Bourg 29, 1754 Avry-sur-Matran, CH-217-3546426-2. Nouvelle société anonyme. Statuts du 23.12.2010.
But:
toutes opérations commerciales et financières se rapportant aux affaires immobilières notamment achat, vente, courtage, expertise, gestion d'entreprise générale et mise en valeur d'immeubles;
gérance d'immeubles;
exploitation d'un bureau d'architecture;
réaliser tous plans, projets et plans financiers pour l'exécution de travaux de construction;
exécuter ou faire exécuter et surveiller tous travaux de construction;
effectuer du travail d'entreprise générale totale (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Capital-actions:
CHF 100'000.--, entièrement libéré, divisé en 100 actions de CHF 1'000.--, nominatives. Restriction de transmissibilité des actions selon statuts.
Apport en nature et reprise de biens:
Selon contrat du 23.12.2010 il a été fait apport à la société de l'immeuble art. 387 du RF Neyruz pour un montant de CHF 500'067.91, accepté pour ce prix. En contrepartie il a été remis 100 actions de CHF 1'000.--, nominatives, aux fondateurs. Le solde de CHF 400'067.91 correspond à une créance en faveur des apporteurs.
Organe de publication:
FOSC.
Communication aux actionnaires:
lettre recommandée, télécopie, courriel ou FOSC.
Administration:
Breney Pierre, de Valleyres-sur-Ursins (VD), à Montreux, président, et Schwab Patrick, de Kerzers et Villorsonnens, à Marsens, secrétaire, tous deux avec signature individuelle. Selon déclaration du 23.12.2010, la société n'est pas soumise à un contrôle ordinaire et renonce à un contrôle restreint.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.