Reports for CannaBroker AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout CannaBroker AG
- CannaBroker AG has its legal headquarters in Oberglatt ZH and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Research and development».
- The company was founded on 27.11.2018 and has one person in its management.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 04.12.2023.
- The company's UID is CHE-379.662.527.
- There are 19 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: Agro Farmer AG, AIP Wild AG, AUTOSERVICE OBERGLATT Jacek Rybczak.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.11.2018
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Oberglatt
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.046.706-9
UID/VAT
CHE-379.662.527
Sector
Research and development
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Handel mit Rohstoffen pflanzlichen Ursprungs mit Verwendungszweck im Lebensmittel-, Kosmetik- und pharmazeutischen Bereich sowie zwecks Weiterverarbeitung zu Produkten des täglichen Gebrauchs. Die Gesellschaft kann zudem Beratungsdienstleistungen anbieten sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Hauptzweck in Zusammenhang stehen.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- CannaBroker SA
- CannaBroker Ltd.
- FENOCAN Switzerland Ltd.
- FENOCAN Schweiz AG
- FENOCAN Suisse SA
- TSUNAGU Ltd.
- TSUNAGU AG
- TSUNAGU SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: CannaBroker AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005899455, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
CannaBroker AG, in Oberglatt, CHE-379.662.527, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 13 vom 19.01.2023, Publ. 1005655916).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Jevtic, Marko, von St. Gallen, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Markovic, Cvjetan, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005655916, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
FENOCAN Schweiz AG, in Oberglatt, CHE-379.662.527, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 112 vom 14.06.2021, Publ. 1005215646).
Statutenänderung:
13.01.2023.
Firma neu:
CannaBroker AG.
Uebersetzungen der Firma neu:
(CannaBroker Ltd.) (CannaBroker SA).
Zweck neu:
Handel mit Rohstoffen pflanzlichen Ursprungs mit Verwendungszweck im Lebensmittel-, Kosmetik- und pharmazeutischen Bereich sowie zwecks Weiterverarbeitung zu Produkten des täglichen Gebrauchs. Die Gesellschaft kann zudem Beratungsdienstleistungen anbieten sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Hauptzweck in Zusammenhang stehen.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bär, Thomas, von Rothrist, in Bülach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Jevtic, Marko, von St. Gallen, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005215646, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
FENOCAN Schweiz AG, in Oberglatt, CHE-379.662.527, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 244 vom 15.12.2020, Publ. 1005047341).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Baumann, Daniel, von Muolen, in Emmen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bär, Thomas, von Rothrist, in Bülach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.