Address
c/o Gelgia Stoffel-Hössli
Veia Granda 42
7440 Andeer
Reports for Cagliatscha-Stiftung
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Cagliatscha-Stiftung
- Cagliatscha-Stiftung is a Foundation with its legal headquarters in Andeer. Cagliatscha-Stiftung belongs to the industry «Religious, political or secular associations» and is currently active.
- The organization was founded on 17.11.1988.
- The organization has last modified its commercial register entry on 29.02.2024. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The UID registered in the commercial register of GR is CHE-101.973.578.
Management (4)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Catrina Salis Haberstich,
Philipp Hössli,
Dr. oec. Rudolf Trepp
newest authorized signatories
Catrina Salis Haberstich,
Philipp Hössli,
Dr. oec. Rudolf Trepp
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.11.1988
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Andeer
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-350.7.000.025-0
UID/VAT
CHE-101.973.578
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Finanzielle Unterstützung von Einwohnern des Kreises Schams in bedrängten wirtschaftlichen Verhältnissen, die Förderung und Erhaltung der romanischen Sprache sowie die Förderung von kulturellen Veranstaltungen und Institutionen und Erhaltung von wichtigen Kulturgütern im Kreis Schams; gleiche Ziele können auch in den Kreisen Rheinwald und Avers verfolgt werden, soweit das Stiftungsvermögen dies zulässt.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Kasper Treuhand AG | Klosters | 10.12.2009 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Cagliatscha-Stiftung
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005974010, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Cagliatscha-Stiftung, in Andeer, CHE-101.973.578, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 106 vom 02.06.2022, Publ. 1005487017).
Domizil neu:
c/o Gelgia Stoffel-Hössli, Veia Granda 42, 7440 Andeer [Behördliche Umadressierung].
Publication number: HR02-1005487017, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Cagliatscha-Stiftung, in Andeer, CHE-101.973.578, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 240 vom 10.12.2009, S.13, Publ. 5385232).
Domizil neu:
c/o Gelgia Stoffel-Hössli, Veia Granda 13, 7440 Andeer.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Conrad, Abraham, von Andeer, in Andeer, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Trepp, Dr. Rudolf E., von Thusis, in Masein, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Hössli, Philipp, von Andeer, in Winterthur, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Salis Haberstich, Catrina, von Andeer, in Andeer, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kasper Treuhand AG (CHE-114.368.323), in Klosters, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Kasper Treuhand AG (CH-350.3.010.398-2), in Klosters-Serneus].
Publication number: 5385232, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Cagliatscha-Stiftung, in Andeer, CH-350.7.000.025-0, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 96 vom 21.05.2008, S. 9, Publ. 4484424).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kasper, Stephan, von Klosters-Serneus, in Klosters-Serneus, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kasper Treuhand AG (CH-350.3.010.398-2), in Klosters (Klosters-Serneus), Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.