Address
Rue du Marché-Concours 14
2350 Saignelégier
Reports for Café du Soleil SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Café du Soleil SA
- Café du Soleil SA is active in the industry «Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Saignelégier.
- The management of the company Café du Soleil SA consists of 6 persons.
- The last commercial register change was made on 01.06.2023. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of JU is CHE-101.423.622.
Management (6)
newest board members
Andrée Germaine Thérèse Guenat-Jobin,
Cléopâtre Anne Willemin,
Sylvain Paul Philippe Dubail,
Julien Froidevaux,
Micheline Hedwige Aubry
newest authorized signatories
Andrée Germaine Thérèse Guenat-Jobin,
Cléopâtre Anne Willemin,
Sylvain Paul Philippe Dubail,
Julien Froidevaux,
Micheline Hedwige Aubry
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
04.02.1980
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Saignelégier
Commercial Registry Office
JU
Commercial register number
CH-674.3.000.548-0
UID/VAT
CHE-101.423.622
Sector
Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Promouvoir un lieu de rencontre, d'animation culturelle, d'échange d'idées et d'entraide sous toutes formes possibles, spécialement en relation avec la vie des Franches-Montagnes
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO SA | Delémont | 28.11.2013 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO SA | Delémont | 14.12.2009 | 27.11.2013 | |
Fiscosa fiscalité et comptabilité SA | Delémont | <2004 | 13.12.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Soleil Vert SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Café du Soleil SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005758638, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Café du Soleil SA, à Saignelégier, CHE-101.423.622, société anonyme (No. FOSC 180 du 18.09.2017, Publ. 3758111).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Baume-Schneider, Elisabeth, de Les Breuleux, à Les Breuleux, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: 3758111, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Café du Soleil SA, à Saignelégier, CHE-101.423.622, société anonyme (No. FOSC 74 du 16.04.2014, Publ. 1457265).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Baumeler, André Jean-Marie, de Le Noirmont, à Saignelégier, membre, avec signature collective à deux;
Saillard, Dominique Henri Nicolas, ressortissant français, à Muriaux, membre, avec signature collective à deux;
Frésard, Marie Jeanne Blanche, de Le Noirmont, à Saignelégier, directrice, avec signature individuelle.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Guenat, Andrée Germaine Thérèse, de Le Noirmont, à Les Bois, vice-présidente du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: membre, avec signature collective à deux];
Willemin, Cléopâtre Anne, de Les Bois, à Les Breuleux, membre et secrétaire du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: membre, avec signature collective à deux];
Baume-Schneider, Elisabeth, de Les Breuleux, à Les Breuleux, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Dubail, Sylvain Paul Philippe, de Clos du Doubs, à Saignelégier, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: 1457265, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Café du Soleil SA, à Saignelégier, CHE-101.423.622, société anonyme (No. FOSC 231 du 28.11.2013, Publ. 1206707).
Modification des statuts:
14.03.2014.
Nouveau capital-actions:
CHF 206'000.00 [précédemment: CHF 178'000.00].
Nouveau capital-actions libéré:
CHF 206'000.00 [précédemment: CHF 178'000.00].
Nouvelles actions:
100 actions nominatives de CHF 1'000.00 et 212 actions nominatives de CHF 500.00. [précédemment: 100 actions nominatives de CHF 1'000.00, 156 actions nominatives de CHF 500.00]. Augmentation autorisée du capital-actions (fondée sur la décision d'autorisation du 30.04.2012).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Convers, Serge, de Grandfontaine, à Saint-Ursanne, président, avec signature collective à deux;
Etter, Rodolphe, de Fräschels, à Le Prédame (Les Genevez JU), membre, avec signature collective à deux;
Pic Jeandupeux, Maryvonne Rosine Nelly, de Courfaivre, à Les Breuleux, membre, avec signature collective à deux;
Jobin, Marie Thérèse, de Aefligen, à Saignelégier, directrice, avec signature individuelle.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Froidevaux, Julien, de Le Bémont JU, à Le Bémont JU, membre, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: secrétaire avec signature collective à deux];
Guenat, Andrée Germaine Thérèse, de Le Noirmont, à Les Bois, membre, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: Guenat, Andrée, à Le Noirmont];
Aubry, Micheline Hedwige, de La Chaux-des-Breuleux, à Saignelégier, membre, avec signature collective à deux;
Frésard, Marie Jeanne Blanche, de Le Noirmont, à Saignelégier, directrice, avec signature individuelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.