Reports for CADHOM SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout CADHOM SA
- CADHOM SA has its legal headquarters in Bussigny, is active and operates in the sector «Trading in consumer goods».
- The management consists of 6 persons. The company was founded on 04.07.2017.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 09.08.2024.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of VD under the UID CHE-420.238.914.
Management (6)
newest board members
Andreas Zaugg,
Tristan Marcel Jean Henri Gratier,
Marco Evaristo Borsotti,
Jean-Noël Eric Jaton
newest authorized signatories
Joffrey Jupille,
Andreas Zaugg,
Ivan Mauroux,
Tristan Marcel Jean Henri Gratier,
Marco Evaristo Borsotti
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
04.07.2017
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Bussigny
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.175.001-2
UID/VAT
CHE-420.238.914
Sector
Trading in consumer goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but l'exploitation d'une centrale d'achat pour des prestataires de services pour les personnes ayant besoin de soutien ainsi que toutes activités ayant un rapport direct ou indirect avec ce but.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO SA | Epalinges | 14.12.2023 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BfB Fidam révision SA | Renens (VD) | 07.07.2017 | 13.12.2023 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: CADHOM SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006103757, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
CADHOM SA, à Bussigny, CHE-420.238.914 (FOSC du 14.12.2023, p. 0/1005910384). La signature de Fuhrer Daniel est radiée. Signature collective à deux est conférée à Jupille Joffrey, de France, à Champanges (France), directeur.
Publication number: HR02-1005910384, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
CADHOM SA, à Bussigny, CHE-420.238.914 (FOSC du 09.12.2022, p. 0/1005625080). La signature de Berg Dorothée est radiée. Zaugg Andreas, de Trub, à Cugy VD, est membre du conseil d'administration avec signature collective à deux. Signature collective à deux est conférée à Mauroux Ivan, de Cheyres-Châbles, à Divonne-les-Bains (France). BfB Fidam révision SA (CHE-106.054.851) n'est plus organe de révision.
Nouvel organe de révision:
BDO SA (CHE-347.141.454), à Epalinges.
Publication number: HR02-1005625080, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
CADHOM SA, à Bussigny, CHE-420.238.914 (FOSC du 28.10.2021, p. 0/1005322285). Statuts modifiés le 23.11.2022.
Nouveau but:
la société a pour but l'exploitation d'une centrale d'achat pour des prestataires de services pour les personnes ayant besoin de soutien ainsi que toutes activités ayant un rapport direct ou indirect avec ce but. Augmentation ordinaire du capital-actions par compensation de créances de CHF 785'000;
en contrepartie, il est remis 5'250 actions de CHF 100.
Nouveau capital-actions entièrement libéré:
CHF 625'000, divisé en 6'250 actions nominatives de CHF 100, avec restrictions quant à la transmissibilité selon statuts.
Nouvelles communications aux actionnaires:
par écrit ou par courrier électronique. Gratier Tristan, qui n'est plus vice-président, est nommé président. Borsotti Marco n'est plus président.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.