Reports for Cadec AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Cadec AG
- Cadec AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Worb. Cadec AG belongs to the industry «Architectural and engineering activities» and is currently active.
- The management consists of 2 persons. The company was founded on 25.06.1985.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 30.12.2022.
- Cadec AG is registered in the Canton of BE under the UID CHE-103.659.992.
- There are currently 9 trademarks or applications for the company Cadec AG in the IPI database.
- Next to the company Cadec AG there are 3 other active companies with an identical address. These include: Addimat AG, Bavicom AG, INiON Holding GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
25.06.1985
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Worb
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-035.3.007.905-9
UID/VAT
CHE-103.659.992
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Entwicklung, Fabrikation und Verkauf von elektronischen Steuerungen aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann Liegenschaften erwerben, überbauen, verkaufen und vermitteln, sich an andern Unternehmen beteiligen usw.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Treuhandbüro Sutter AG | Langnau im Emmental | <2004 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
x-logic | 25.08.2004 | active | 53634/2004 |
26.08.2003 | active | 51366/2003 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Cadec AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005642376, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Cadec AG, in Worb, CHE-103.659.992, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 106 vom 04.06.2021, Publ. 1005206599).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hebeisen, Hans, von Eggiwil, in Rubigen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Blagojevic, Sasa, genannt Sascha, von Münsingen, in Rubigen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit Hans Hebeisen];
Blagojevic, Andrea, von Eggiwil und Münsingen, in Rubigen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit Hans Hebeisen].
Publication number: HR02-1005206599, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Cadec AG, in Worb, CHE-103.659.992, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 39 vom 26.02.2015, S.0, Publ. 2011219).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Blagojevic, Sasa, genannt Sascha, von Münsingen, in Rubigen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit Hans Hebeisen;
Blagojevic, Andrea, von Eggiwil und Münsingen, in Rubigen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit Hans Hebeisen;
Hebeisen, Hans, von Eggiwil, in Rubigen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 2011219, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Cadec AG, in Worb, CHE-103.659.992, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 10 vom 16.01.2008, S. 3, Publ. 4291728).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Treuhandbüro Sutter AG (CHE-100.188.022), in Langnau im Emmental, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Treuhandbüro Sutter AG].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.