Reports for BSA Softtrade AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout BSA Softtrade AG
- BSA Softtrade AG has its legal headquarters in Baar and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «IT services».
- The management has 3 active persons registered.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 22.12.2017. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of ZG under the UID CHE-113.536.351.
- The address is identical with 6 other active companies. These include: BSA Informatik AG, immodry baumanagement gmbh, immodry gmbh.
Management (3)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Michael Erwin Spirig,
Tamara Nicole Bösch,
Bruno Hanspeter Bösch
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.03.2007
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Baar
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-170.3.030.559-4
UID/VAT
CHE-113.536.351
Sector
IT services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Handel und Vertrieb von Software; kann Darlehen gewähren, sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen oder sich mit diesen zusammenschliessen sowie Grundstücke erwerben, halten und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Kern Treuhand AG | Dübendorf | 29.11.2010 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Trebag Treuhand & Beratungs GmbH | Schaffhausen | 03.04.2007 | 28.11.2010 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: BSA Softtrade AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 3951521, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
BSA Softtrade AG, in Baar, CHE-113.536.351, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 203 vom 19.10.2016, Publ. 3116283).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bürgin, Thomas, von Lenzburg, in Zürich, Zeichnungsberechtigter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Spirig, Michael Erwin, von Widnau, in Stetten (SH), Zeichnungsberechtigter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Zollinger, Tamara Nicole, von Oetwil am See, in Baar, Zeichnungsberechtigte, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 3116283, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
BSA Softtrade AG, in Baar, CHE-113.536.351, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 49 vom 12.03.2013, Publ. 7100026).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Meyer, Sandra, von Reisiswil, in Büren an der Aare, Zeichnungsberechtigte, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 7100026, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
BSA Softtrade AG, in Baar, CH-170.3.030.559-4, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 232 vom 29.11.2010, S. 20, Publ. 5913790).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Meyer, Sandra, von Reisiswil, in Büren an der Aare, Zeichnungsberechtigte, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Bürgin, Thomas, von Lenzburg, in Zürich, Zeichnungsberechtigter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.