Address
Rue des Champs-Lovats 7
1400 Yverdon-les-Bains
Reports for Brûleur services Yverdon Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Brûleur services Yverdon Sàrl
- Brûleur services Yverdon Sàrl in Yverdon-les-Bains is a Limited liability company from the sector «Repair and installation of machines and equipment». Brûleur services Yverdon Sàrl is active.
- The management of the company Brûleur services Yverdon Sàrl consists of 2 persons.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 02.12.2019, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-114.677.758.
- There are 2 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: Bardet Christian Chauffage Sanitaire Sàrl, Sani-Bois Sàrl.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.01.2009
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Yverdon-les-Bains
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.056.757-5
UID/VAT
CHE-114.677.758
Sector
Repair and installation of machines and equipment
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
L'entretien, le dépannage et la vente de brûleurs
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Brûleur services Yverdon Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004772747, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Brûleur services Yverdon Sàrl, à Yverdon-les-Bains, CHE-114.677.758 (FOSC du 27.05.2014, p. 0/1524315). Randin Philippe, qui n'est plus associé-gérant et dont la signature est radiée, cède ses 10 parts de CHF 1'000 à l'associée-gérante Chuard Jenifer, laquelle est élue présidente et continue de signer individuellement, désormais titulaire de 20 parts de CHF 1'000.
Publication number: 1524315, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Brûleur services Yverdon Sàrl, à Yverdon-les-Bains, CHE-114.677.758 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225834).
Nouvelle adresse:
rue des Champs Lovats 7, 1400 Yverdon-les-Bains.
Nouvelle autre adresse:
ruelle du Collège 9, 1432 Belmont-Yverdon. L'associé-gérant Randin Philippe, nommé président, maintenant à Corcelles-près-Concise, cède 10 de ses 20 parts de CHF 1'000 à Chuard Jenifer, de Rances, à Belmont-sur-Yverdon, nouvelle associée avec 10 parts de CHF 1'000, gérante avec signature individuelle;
Randin Philippe reste associé avec 10 parts de CHF 1'000. Signature individuelle est conférée à Chuard Joël, de Corcelles-près-Payerne, à Belmont-sur-Yverdon, gérant.
Publication number: 4842068, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Brûleur services Yverdon Sàrl, à 1400 Yverdon-les-Bains, rue des Jordils 23 bis, CH-550-1056757-5. Nouvelle société à responsabilité limitée.
Statuts:
15 janvier 2009.
But:
l'entretien, le dépannage et la vente de brûleurs (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Obligation de fournir des prestations accessoires, droits de préférence, de préemption ou d'emption:
pour les détails, voir les statuts. Selon déclaration du gérant du 15 janvier 2009, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte.
Capital social:
CHF 20'000.
Reprise de biens envisagée:
actifs et passifs de l'entreprise individuelle 'Brûleur services, Philippe Randin', à Yverdon-les-Bains, pour un montant maximum de CHF 25'000.
Associé-gérant avec signature individuelle:
Randin Philippe, de Rances, à Yverdon-les-Bains, avec 20 parts de CHF 1'000.
Organe de publication:
Feuille officielle suisse du commerce.
Communications aux associés:
par écrit ou par courriel.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.