Reports for Broclean Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Broclean Sàrl
- Broclean Sàrl is currently active and the industry «Facility management». The legal headquarters are in Bulle.
- The management of the company Broclean Sàrl consists of 3 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 12.08.2004.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 05.05.2021.
- The reported UID is CHE-111.964.262.
- There are 2 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: Brocorma SA, Broda'Lane Sàrl.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
12.08.2004
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Bulle
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.3.531.615-6
UID/VAT
CHE-111.964.262
Sector
Facility management
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Exploitation d'une entreprise active dans la technique et l'entretien du bâtiment (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire & Fiscalité Furter SA | Corcelles-près-Payerne | 26.05.2011 | 29.01.2018 | |
Fiduciaire Ruffieux S.A. | Bulle | 07.05.2009 | 25.05.2011 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Mitrettes Sàrl en liquidation
- Mitrettes Sàrl
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Broclean Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005169791, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Broclean Sàrl, à Bulle, CHE-111.964.262 (FOSC du 30.01.2018, p. 0/4023399).
Nouvelle adresse:
Rue du Moulin 49, 1630 Bulle.
Personne inscrite modifiée:
Corminboeuf Alexandra, associée, 20 parts de CHF 1'000, gérante, signature individuelle, maintenant gérante, signature individuelle.
Nouvelle personne inscrite:
Brocorma SA (CHE-222.054.904), à Bulle, associée, 20 parts de CHF 1'000.
Publication number: 4023399, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Broclean Sàrl, à Bulle, CHE-111.964.262 (FOSC du 09.06.2016, p. 0/2879961). Selon déclaration du 30.08.2017, la société n'est pas soumise à un contrôle ordinaire et renonce à un contrôle restreint. Fiduciaire & Fiscalité Furter SA (CH-550-1052717-4) n'est plus organe de révision.
Publication number: 2879961, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Mitrettes Sàrl en liquidation, à Bulle, CHE-111.964.262 (FOSC du 20.01.2016, p. 0/2607925). Par procès-verbal authentique du 24.05.2016, la dissolution décidée le 23.12.2015 est révoquée, les actifs de la société n'ayant pas été répartis. Par conséquent la raison sociale devient Mitrettes Sàrl. Corminboeuf Alexandra n'est plus liquidatrice.
Nouvelle adresse:
Rue de Gruyères 16, 1630 Bulle.
Nouvelle raison sociale:
Broclean Sàrl.
Nouveau but:
exploitation d'une entreprise active dans la technique et l'entretien du bâtiment (cf. statuts pour but complet). Statuts modifiés le 24.05.2016. Corminboeuf Alexandra, associée, est nommée gérante avec signature individuelle. Brodard Jean-Claude, de La Roche, à Bulle, est nommé gérant et président avec signature individuelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.