Address
c/o Die Falck Gruppe AG
Ledergasse 11
6004 Luzern
Reports for Brazil Investment und Management AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Brazil Investment und Management AG
- Brazil Investment und Management AG has its legal headquarters in Luzern and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties».
- The management has 3 active persons registered.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 26.10.2021.
- The company Brazil Investment und Management AG is registered under the UID CHE-378.683.521.
- Companies with an identical address: Adli Verwaltungs-AG, Bergbeizli J&C AG, Die Falck Gruppe AG.
Management (3)
newest board members
Moritz Charles Louis Falck,
Philipp Gregory Leutwyler,
Hans Ulrich Leutwyler
newest authorized signatories
Moritz Charles Louis Falck,
Philipp Gregory Leutwyler,
Hans Ulrich Leutwyler
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
09.11.2015
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Luzern
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.3.800.933-3
UID/VAT
CHE-378.683.521
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerb, Verkauf, Überbauung und Verwaltung von Immobilien; Verwaltung von Finanzen und Beteiligungen; Beteiligung an Unternehmungen mit gleichartigem oder ähnlichem Geschäftsbereich.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Brazil Investment und Management AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005319936, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Brazil Investment und Management AG, in Luzern, CHE-378.683.521, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 250 vom 23.12.2020, Publ. 1005055998).
Domizil neu:
c/o Die Falck Gruppe AG, Ledergasse 11, 6004 Luzern.
Publication number: HR02-1005055998, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Brazil Investment und Management AG, in Luzern, CHE-378.683.521, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 220 vom 12.11.2015, S.0, Publ. 2477835).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Falck, Ludwig, genannt Louis, von Wil SG, Neckertal, Baden und Luzern, in Meggen, Delegierter, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Leutwyler, Philipp, von Lupfig, in Zug, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Bragança Paulista (BR), Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Falck, Moritz, von Luzern, in Zürich, Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Leutwyler, Hans Ulrich, von Lupfig, in Zug, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Leutwyler, Hans Ulrich, in Bragança Paulista (BR), Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 2477835, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Brazil Investment und Management AG, in Luzern, CHE-378.683.521, c/o Falck & Cie. AG, Ledergasse 11, 6004 Luzern, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
04.11.2015.
Zweck:
Erwerb, Verkauf, Überbauung und Verwaltung von Immobilien;
Verwaltung von Finanzen und Beteiligungen;
Beteiligung an Unternehmungen mit gleichartigem oder ähnlichem Geschäftsbereich.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Aktien:
100 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen erfolgen durch Brief.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Gemäss Erklärung des Gründers vom 04.11.2015 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Eingetragene Personen:
Leutwyler, Philipp, von Lupfig, in Bragança Paulista (BR), Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Falck, Ludwig, genannt Louis, von Wil SG, Neckertal, Baden und Luzern, in Meggen, Delegierter, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Leutwyler, Hans Ulrich, von Lupfig, in Bragança Paulista (BR), Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.