Address
Avenue des Comtes de Savoie 76
1913 Saillon
Reports for BOURDIN PIMO SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout BOURDIN PIMO SA
- BOURDIN PIMO SA has its legal headquarters in Saillon and is active. It operates in the sector «Manufacturing of other electrical equipment/appliances».
- There are 3 active persons registered in the management.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 11.02.2022. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of VS is CHE-236.928.308.
Management (3)
newest board members
Natalie Josette Bourdin,
Pierre Félix Denis Bourdin,
Monique Marie Louise Maury Bourdin
newest authorized signatories
Natalie Josette Bourdin,
Pierre Félix Denis Bourdin,
Monique Marie Louise Maury Bourdin
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
23.12.2020
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Saillon
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-621.3.009.792-7
UID/VAT
CHE-236.928.308
Sector
Manufacturing of other electrical equipment/appliances
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Toutes activités liées au développement durable, développement et commercialisation de brevet de panneaux solaires ou autres énergies, achat, diffusion, vente et installation d'articles en tous genres dans le domaine énergétique, ainsi que leur réparation et tous autres services après-vente, exploitation d'établissements publics liés à la consommation d'alcool et/ou à la restauration; la société pourra effectuer toute opération mobilière et immobilière à l'exclusion d'opérations prohibées par la LFAIE.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: BOURDIN PIMO SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005404040, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
BOURDIN PIMO SA, à Saillon, CHE-236.928.308, société anonyme (No. FOSC 253 du 29.12.2020, Publ. 1005061828).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Seppey, Jean Pierre Lucien, de Hérémence, à Saillon, membre et secrétaire du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux avec le président.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Bourdin, Pierre Félix Denis, citoyen français, à Saillon, président du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: à Leytron];
Bourdin, Natalie Josette, citoyenne française, à Saillon, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux avec le président;
Maury ép. Bourdin, Monique Marie Louise, citoyenne française, à Saillon, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux avec le président [précédemment: à Leytron].
Publication number: HR01-1005061828, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
BOURDIN PIMO SA, à Saillon, CHE-236.928.308, Avenue des Comtes de Savoie 76, 1913 Saillon, société anonyme (Nouvelle inscription).
Date des statuts:
22.12.2020.
But:
toutes activités liées au développement durable, développement et commercialisation de brevet de panneaux solaires ou autres énergies, achat, diffusion, vente et installation d'articles en tous genres dans le domaine énergétique, ainsi que leur réparation et tous autres services après-vente, exploitation d'établissements publics liés à la consommation d'alcool et/ou à la restauration;
la société pourra effectuer toute opération mobilière et immobilière à l'exclusion d'opérations prohibées par la LFAIE.
Capital-actions:
CHF 100'000.00.
Capital-actions libéré:
CHF 100'000.00.
Actions:
100 actions nominatives de CHF 1'000.00 avec restriction de transmissibilité selon statuts.
Organe de publication:
FOSC.
Communications aux actionnaires:
par écrit ou courriel. Selon déclaration du 22.12.2020, il est renoncé à un contrôle restreint.
Personne(s) inscrite(s):
Bourdin, Pierre Félix Denis, citoyen français, à Leytron, président du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle;
Seppey, Jean Pierre Lucien, de Hérémence, à Saillon, membre et secrétaire du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux avec le président;
Maury ép. Bourdin, Monique Marie Louise, citoyenne française, à Leytron, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux avec le président.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.