Branches (1)
Reports for Boettcher AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Boettcher AG
- Boettcher AG with its legal headquarters in Adligenswil is active. Boettcher AG operates in the sector «Trading in consumer goods».
- The management has 5 active persons registered.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 27.10.2023. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The company Boettcher AG is registered under the UID CHE-107.837.488.
- The IPI database currently contains 10 trademarks or applications for the company Boettcher AG.
- There are 17 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: ADOMAS GmbH, ansalia GmbH, BRERO Schweiz AG.
Management (5)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Jozef Karaka,
Maria Theresia Brunner,
Christian Stutz,
René Müller,
Catja Clara Müller-Haslimann
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.10.1934
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Adligenswil
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.903.727-2
UID/VAT
CHE-107.837.488
Sector
Trading in consumer goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Handel mit sowie Produktion von Verbrauchs- und Gebrauchsgütern aller Art; Kauf, Verkauf und Nutzung von Lizenzen und Marken; Beteiligungen; Erwerb, Halten und Veräusserung von Immobilien.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
OPTEX Audit AG | Kriens | 24.09.2018 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Süess Treuhand GmbH in Liquidation | Stansstad | 18.02.2009 | 23.09.2018 | |
Comember Treuhand AG in Liq. | Luzern | <2004 | 17.02.2009 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
MULTIFORT | 26.03.2019 | active | 80731/2018 |
06.02.2018 | active | 62387/2017 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Boettcher AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005870518, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Boettcher AG, in Adligenswil, CHE-107.837.488, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 45 vom 06.03.2023, Publ. 1005693277).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schuler, Paula, von Rothenthurm, in Luzern, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Karaka, Jozef, slowakischer Staatsangehöriger, in Ebikon, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005693277, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Boettcher AG, in Adligenswil, CHE-107.837.488, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 251 vom 27.12.2022, Publ. 1005638535).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kessler, Sibylle Tabea, von Luzern, in Rain, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Brunner, Maria Theresia, von Spiringen, in Adligenswil, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Schuler, Paula, von Rothenthurm, in Luzern, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005638535, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Boettcher AG, in Adligenswil, CHE-107.837.488, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 127 vom 04.07.2022, Publ. 1005511074).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
OPTEX Audit AG (CHE-108.767.896), in Kriens, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Revia AG Die Revisionsexperten (CHE-108.767.896)].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.