Address
c/o Alto Groupe SA
Route de la Gare 36
2012 Auvernier
Reports for BN Nutrition SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout BN Nutrition SA
- BN Nutrition SA is active in the industry «Operation of other financial institutions» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Auvernier.
- The management of the company BN Nutrition SA consists of one person.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 19.07.2024. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-100.854.758.
- There are 23 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: AIREM SA, Alto Groupe Holding SA, Alto Groupe SA.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.04.1987
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Milvignes
Commercial Registry Office
NE
Commercial register number
CH-217.0.138.109-7
UID/VAT
CHE-100.854.758
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Commerce de compléments alimentaires ainsi que la commercialisation de tous produits ou prestations de services liés à la prévention, au bien-être et à la forme physique et mentale (pour but complet, cf. statuts).
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fireco S.A. Fiscalité, révision et conseils | Fribourg | 31.10.2008 | 14.07.2009 | |
SwissAudit (Mittelland) SA | Fribourg | <2004 | 30.10.2008 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Ambag Beteiligungs AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: BN Nutrition SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006089704, Commercial Registry Office Neuenburg, (645)
BN Nutrition SA, précédemment à Lausanne, CHE-100.854.758 (FOSC du 01.07.2021, p. 0/100523615).
Nouveau siège:
Milvignes, route de la Gare 36, c/o Alto Groupe SA, 2012 Auvernier. Statuts modifiés le 18.06.2024. D'Amato Adriano n'est plus membre du conseil d'administration;
ses pouvoirs sont radiés. La procuration de Clot Laura est radiée. Bourquin Olivier, jusqu'ici président, désormais administrateur unique, signe désormais individuellement.
Publication number: HR02-1006089673, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
BN Nutrition SA, à Lausanne, CHE-100.854.758 (FOSC du 01.07.2021, p. 0/1005236215). La société ayant transféré son siège à Milvignes, la raison de commerce est radiée d'office du Registre du commerce du canton de Vaud.
Publication number: HR02-1005236215, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
BN Nutrition SA, à Lausanne, CHE-100.854.758 (FOSC du 07.04.2021, p. 0/1005142766). D'Amato Adriano, de et à Cottens (FR), est membre du conseil d'administration avec signature collective à deux.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.