Reports for BM Schreiner-Service GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout BM Schreiner-Service GmbH
- BM Schreiner-Service GmbH has its legal headquarters in Höri and is active. It operates in the sector «Production and processing of wooden goods».
- The management of the company BM Schreiner-Service GmbH, which was founded on the 29.03.2023, consists of one person.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 04.12.2023, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is CHE-344.174.262.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.03.2023
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Höri
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.4.080.454-8
UID/VAT
CHE-344.174.262
Sector
Production and processing of wooden goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Ausführung von Schreinerarbeiten, insbesondere Innenausbau, Service-Arbeiten und Ausfertigung von Möbeln nach Mass. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- BM Schreiner Montagen GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: BM Schreiner-Service GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005899451, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
BM Schreiner-Service GmbH, in Höri, CHE-344.174.262, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 203 vom 19.10.2023, Publ. 1005864075).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Josic, Aleksander, von Büron, in Hausen (AG), Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 99 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Maag, Benjamin Joel, von Stadel, in Höri, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 101 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00].
Publication number: HR02-1005864075, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
BM Schreiner Montagen GmbH, in Höri, CHE-344.174.262, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 120 vom 23.06.2023, Publ. 1005775992).
Statutenänderung:
09.10.2023.
Firma neu:
BM Schreiner-Service GmbH.
Mitteilungen neu:
Die Mitteilungen der Geschäftsführung an die Gesellschafter erfolgen per Brief oder E-Mail.
Publication number: HR02-1005775992, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
BM Schreiner Montagen GmbH, in Höri, CHE-344.174.262, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 65 vom 03.04.2023, Publ. 1005714969).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Maag, Benjamin Joel, von Stadel, in Höri, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 101 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00];
Josic, Aleksander, von Büron, in Hausen (AG), Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 99 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.