Address
c/o André Jacober
Höflistrasse 122
8135 Langnau am Albis
Reports for Bless Serving gemeinnützige GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Bless Serving gemeinnützige GmbH
- Bless Serving gemeinnützige GmbH has its legal headquarters in Langnau am Albis and is active. It operates in the sector «Religious, political or secular associations».
- The company was founded on 16.09.2020 and has 2 persons in its management.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 12.05.2021.
- The company Bless Serving gemeinnützige GmbH is registered under the UID CHE-451.442.586.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
16.09.2020
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Langnau am Albis
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.4.071.760-2
UID/VAT
CHE-451.442.586
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Ausführung und Förderung von religiösen und kulturellen Aktivitäten aller Art mit einem sozial-, und karikativen Zweck.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Bless Serving gemeinnützige GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005178369, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Bless Serving gemeinnützige GmbH, in Langnau am Albis, CHE-451.442.586, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 50 vom 12.03.2021, Publ. 1005122051).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bürgler, Isabelle, von Illgau, in Adliswil, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 4 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Varrese, Antonio, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Bäretswil, Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 4 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Jacober, André, von Glarus, in Langnau am Albis, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: mit 192 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00];
Jacober, Laura, von Marthalen, in Langnau am Albis, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Publication number: HR02-1005122051, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Bless Serving gemeinnützige GmbH, in Langnau am Albis, CHE-451.442.586, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 183 vom 21.09.2020, Publ. 1004981950).
Domizil neu:
c/o André Jacober, Höflistrasse 122, 8135 Langnau am Albis.
Publication number: HR01-1004981950, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Bless Serving gemeinnützige GmbH, in Langnau am Albis, CHE-451.442.586, Berghaldenweg 1, 8135 Langnau am Albis, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
11.09.2020.
Zweck:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Ausführung und Förderung von religiösen und kulturellen Aktivitäten aller Art mit einem sozial-, und karikativen Zweck.
Stammkapital:
CHF 20'000.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen der Geschäftsführung an die Gesellschafter erfolgen per Brief, E-Mail oder Telefax an die im Anteilbuch verzeichneten Adressen. Gemäss Erklärung vom 11.09.2020 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Eingetragene Personen:
Jacober, André, von Glarus, in Langnau am Albis, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 192 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Bürgler, Isabelle, von Illgau, in Adliswil, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 4 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Varrese, Antonio, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Bäretswil, Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 4 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.