Reports for Bio-Cos AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Bio-Cos AG
- Bio-Cos AG with its legal headquarters in Jonen is active. Bio-Cos AG operates in the sector «Production of chemical products».
- The management has 2 active persons registered.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 31.01.2020. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of AG is CHE-107.381.815.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
21.01.1992
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Jonen
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.017.109-7
UID/VAT
CHE-107.381.815
Sector
Production of chemical products
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Beratung und Planung im Bereich der Sanitär-, Haus-, Ver- und Entsorgungstechnik sowie Entwicklung, Herstellung und Vertrieb von kosmetischen, biologischen, chemischen und chemisch-technischen Produkten; kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
DW Treuhand AG | Moosleerau | <2004 | 30.01.2020 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Hofer und Partner AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
Bio-Cos | 31.07.2003 | deleted | 51340/2003 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Bio-Cos AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004819544, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Bio-Cos AG, in Jonen, CHE-107.381.815, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 87 vom 07.05.2018, Publ. 4215363). Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 11.01.2020 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
DW Treuhand AG (CHE-108.203.033), in Moosleerau, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 4215363, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Bio-Cos AG, in Jonen, CHE-107.381.815, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 35 vom 19.02.2016, Publ. 2678149).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Cavelti, Sonya, von Sagogn, in Jonen, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Cavelti, Livio, von Sagogn, in Jonen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 2678149, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Bio-Cos AG, in Jonen, CHE-107.381.815, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 189 vom 29.09.2011, Publ. 6355348).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Cavelti, Laila, von Sagogn, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Cavelti, Sonya, von Sagogn, in Jonen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.