Reports for BinC Industries SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout BinC Industries SA
- BinC Industries SA in Commugny is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Research and development». BinC Industries SA is active.
- The management consists of 7 persons. The company was founded on 01.10.2007.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 03.02.2022. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The UID registered in the commercial register of VD is CHE-113.842.316.
- AGM Alliance SA, Be.Pilates Murphy-Schneuwly, SAKIAL Sàrl are registered at the same address.
Management (7)
newest board members
John Peter Rupert,
Laurent Cataldo,
Adrian Martin Flury,
Frédéric Bajard,
Sunil Taneja
newest authorized signatories
John Peter Rupert,
Corentin Julien Valérian Mulkens,
Laurent Cataldo,
Adrian Martin Flury,
Frédéric Bajard
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.10.2007
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Commugny
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-670.3.004.388-2
UID/VAT
CHE-113.842.316
Sector
Research and development
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but le développement, la fabrication, la commercialisation et la distribution de produits industriels ainsi que toute prestation de services et conseil dans ces domaines (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Multifiduciaire Léman SA | Lausanne | 14.04.2014 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
REVICOM SA | Delémont | 05.10.2007 | 13.04.2014 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- BESTinCLASS Industries SA
- BESTinCLSASS Industries SA
- B Management Holding SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: BinC Industries SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005396883, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
BinC Industries SA, à Commugny, CHE-113.842.316 (FOSC du 06.05.2021, p. 0/1005172191). Statuts modifiés le 22.12.2021. Augmentation ordinaire du capital-actions par compensation de créances de CHF 230'000;
en contrepartie, il est remis 23 actions de CHF 100.
Nouveau capital-actions entièrement libéré:
CHF 177'400, divisé en 1'774 actions nominatives de CHF 100.
Publication number: HR02-1005172191, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
BinC Industries SA, à Commugny, CHE-113.842.316 (FOSC du 11.11.2020, p. 0/1005020494). Statuts modifiés le 27.04.2021. L'assemblée générale a supprimé une clause statutaire relative à une augmentation autorisée du capital (selon décision du 31.01.2018) par décision du 27.04.2021. L'assemblée générale a introduit une clause statutaire relative à une augmentation conditionnelle du capital par décision du 27.04.2021. Pour les détails, voir les statuts.
Publication number: HR02-1005020494, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
BinC Industries SA, à Commugny, CHE-113.842.316 (FOSC du 27.10.2020, p. 0/1005009185). Keller Vincent n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée. Mulkens Hubert est nommé président et continue à signer collectivement à deux, toutefois pas avec Mulkens Corentin.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.