Reports for Biker's Point SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Biker's Point SA
- Biker's Point SA with its legal headquarters in Morges is active. Biker's Point SA operates in the sector «Dealing and repair of automobiles and motorcycles».
- The management of the company Biker's Point SA consists of 2 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 09.12.2005.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 21.08.2024. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The company's UID is CHE-112.669.937.
- The address is identical with 9 other active companies. These include: CAREIS SA, Easy Rider Lounge de Jesus Joao Paulo, Habitat Holding Family SA.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
09.12.2005
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Morges
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.045.735-0
UID/VAT
CHE-112.669.937
Sector
Dealing and repair of automobiles and motorcycles
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but d'offrir des services destinés principalement aux motards, notamment dans les domaines suivants: le commerce, la réparation, l'entretien et la location de motocyclettes et d'accessoires; la gestion d'un bar et d'un lieu de restauration; les services de barbier et de coiffeur; la tenue d'un atelier de tatouages; les services d'hôtellerie (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
VSF Audit SA | Lausanne | 22.07.2024 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
FORVIS MAZARS SA | Lausanne | 04.04.2012 | 21.07.2024 | |
Fiduciaire Saugy S.A. | Lausanne | 10.12.2009 | 03.04.2012 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Biker's Point SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006111221, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Biker's Point SA, à Morges, CHE-112.669.937 (FOSC du 22.07.2024, p. 0/1006090747). La signature de Rochat Gaétan est radiée. Signature individuelle est conférée à Blanc Laurent, de Carouge (GE), à Onex, directeur.
Publication number: HR02-1006090747, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Biker's Point SA, à Morges, CHE-112.669.937 (FOSC du 05.02.2024, p. 0/1005952861). MAZARS SA (CHE-281.111.934) n'est plus organe de révision.
Nouvel organe de révision:
VSF Audit SA (CHE-462.121.175), à Lausanne.
Publication number: HR02-1005952861, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Biker's Point SA, à Morges, CHE-112.669.937 (FOSC du 26.01.2024, p. 0/1005945639). Meunier Philippe et Meunier Nathalie ne sont plus administrateurs;
leur signature est radiée. Catelin Benoit, de France, à Rolle, est membre du conseil d'administration avec signature individuelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.