Address
Via Ginevra 5
6900 Lugano
Reports for BI-QEM SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout BI-QEM SA
- BI-QEM SA with its legal headquarters in Lugano is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Business management and administration». BI-QEM SA is active.
- There are 4 active persons registered in the management.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 21.07.2022. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The UID registered in the commercial register of TI is CHE-114.735.410.
- The address is identical with 48 other active companies. These include: ABEAR PARTECIPAZIONI INDUSTRIALI E COMMERCIALI SA, Active Ownership & Financial Advisory Sagl, Agile HR Sagl.
Management (4)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Enrico Maria Calegari,
Lino Colombo,
Giorgio Mariani,
Claudio Colombo
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
20.02.2009
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Lugano
Commercial Registry Office
TI
Commercial register number
CH-501.3.012.363-8
UID/VAT
CHE-114.735.410
Sector
Business management and administration
Purpose (Original language)
La fornitura di servizi a tutte le società del gruppo nonché a terzi, in particolare l'amministrazione, la gestione, il commercio di materie prime, l'acquisto e la vendita di macchinari ed accessori necessari per la produzione delle varie società del gruppo e la prestazione di servizi commerciali e finanziari. La società può svolgere tutte le operazioni connesse con lo scopo sociale ed operazioni analoghe.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
S&A Tax & Audit SA | Lugano | 12.02.2018 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PKF CERTIFICA SA | Lugano | 27.05.2016 | 11.02.2018 | |
MDR Audit Sagl in liquidazione | Lugano | 24.12.2014 | 26.05.2016 | |
Fiduciaria Antonini Revisioni SA in liquidazione | Lugano | 22.07.2010 | 23.12.2014 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- BI-QUEM SA
- CHEMIPLASTICA SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: BI-QEM SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005526330, Commercial Registry Office Ticino, (501)
BI-QEM SA, in Lugano, CHE-114.735.410, società anonima (Nr. FUSC 70 del 13.04.2021, Pubbl. 1005148150).
Persone dimissionarie e firme cancellate:
Keller, Melis, cittadina italiana, in Lugano, direttrice, con firma individuale.
Nuove persone iscritte o modifiche:
Calegari, Enrico Maria, cittadino italiano, in Crans-Montana, direttore, con firma individuale.
Publication number: HR02-1005148150, Commercial Registry Office Ticino, (501)
BI-QEM SA, in Lugano, CHE-114.735.410, società anonima (Nr. FUSC 232 del 27.11.2020, Pubbl. 1005033746).
Nuove persone iscritte o modifiche:
Colombo, Lino, cittadino italiano, in Gallarate (IT), direttore, con firma individuale.
Publication number: HR02-1005033746, Commercial Registry Office Ticino, (501)
BI-QEM SA, in Lugano, CHE-114.735.410, società anonima (Nr. FUSC 233 del 02.12.2019, Pubbl. 1004772667).
Persone dimissionarie e firme cancellate:
Coppari, Matteo, cittadino italiano, in Lugano, direttore, con firma individuale.
Nuove persone iscritte o modifiche:
Keller, Melis, cittadina italiana, in Lugano, direttrice, con firma individuale.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.