Branches (4)
Reports for BETELEC S.A. ingénieurs-conseils en électricité
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout BETELEC S.A. ingénieurs-conseils en électricité
- BETELEC S.A. ingénieurs-conseils en électricité in Villars-Ste-Croix is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Architectural and engineering activities». BETELEC S.A. ingénieurs-conseils en électricité is active.
- BETELEC S.A. ingénieurs-conseils en électricité has 6 persons entered in its management.
- The last commercial register change was made on 23.11.2022. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of VD is CHE-107.880.923.
- On the same address there are 2 other active companies registered. These include: Hälg & Co. AG, succursale de Villars-Sainte-Croix, Klima AG, succursale de Villars-Sainte-Croix.
Management (6)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Daniel Philippe Margot,
Franck Jurain,
Josette Hélène Rachel Frésard,
Guillaume Thouvenin,
Christophe Bertschy
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
06.05.1976
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Villars-Sainte-Croix
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.175.979-2
UID/VAT
CHE-107.880.923
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but l'exploitation d'un bureau d'ingénieurs conseils spécialisé en électricité (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fidinter SA | Lausanne | 29.09.2021 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BfB Société Fiduciaire Bourquin frères et Béran SA | Renens (VD) | <2004 | 28.09.2021 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- BETELEC S.A. ingénieurs-conseils en électricité.
- Bureau d'ingénieurs-conseils en électricité Betelec SA
- BETELEC SA ingénieurs-conseils en électricité
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: BETELEC S.A. ingénieurs-conseils en électricité
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005611288, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
BETELEC S.A. ingénieurs-conseils en électricité, à Villars-Sainte-Croix, CHE-107.880.923 (FOSC du 29.09.2021, p. 0/1005301387). Chambettaz Dominique et Schweiter Pierre Carl ne sont plus administrateurs;
leur signature est radiée. Margot Daniel Philippe, de Sainte-Croix, à Neuchâtel, est membre du conseil d'administration avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005301387, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
BETELEC S.A. ingénieurs-conseils en électricité, à Villars-Sainte-Croix, CHE-107.880.923 (FOSC du 18.05.2020, p. 0/1004891938). BfB Société Fiduciaire Bourquin frères et Béran SA (CH-550-0111202-6) n'est plus organe de révision.
Nouvel organe de révision:
Fidinter SA (CHE-105.925.319), à Lausanne.
Publication number: HR02-1004891938, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
BETELEC S.A. ingénieurs-conseils en électricité, à Villars-Sainte-Croix, CHE-107.880.923 (FOSC du 19.07.2019, p. 0/1004680341). La signature de Savona Marco est radiée.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.