Reports for Benninger Ingenieure AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Benninger Ingenieure AG
- Benninger Ingenieure AG is currently active and the industry «Architectural and engineering activities». The legal headquarters are in Murten.
- The company was founded on 07.09.1999.
- The last commercial register change was made on 25.11.2019. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The company Benninger Ingenieure AG is registered under the UID CHE-105.210.290.
Management (4)
newest board members
Ramon Benninger,
Fabian Benninger,
Daniel Benninger,
Monika Benninger-Hausammann
newest authorized signatories
Fabian Benninger,
Daniel Benninger,
Monika Benninger-Hausammann
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
07.09.1999
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Murten
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.0.530.789-6
UID/VAT
CHE-105.210.290
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erbringen von Dienstleistungen im gesamten Bauingenieurbereich.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BM Treuhand Murten AG | Murten | 17.06.2011 | 09.12.2012 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Benninger Ingenieure AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004767094, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Benninger Ingenieure AG, in Murten, CHE-105.210.290 (SHAB vom 23.06.2016, s. 0/2908483).
Neue Adresse:
Engelhardstrasse 1, 3280 Murten.
Publication number: 2908483, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Benninger Ingenieure AG, in Murten, CHE-105.210.290 (SHAB vom 19.12.2013, s. 0/7225828). Benninger Ramon, von Murten, in Courgevaux, ist zum Verwaltungsratsmitglied ohne Unterschrift ernannt worden.
Publication number: 6966322, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Benninger Ingenieure AG, in Murten, CH-217-0530789-6, Erbringen von Dienstleistungen im gesamten Bauingenieurbereich. (SHAB vom 17.06.2011, s. 0/6209834). Statuten geändert am 29.11.2012.
Mitteilung an die Aktionäre:
schriftlich, mit Telefax oder elektronischer Post und/oder durch Publikation im SHAB. Benninger Fabian, von Jeuss, in Courgevaux, ist zum Verwaltungsratsmitglied und Sekretär mit Einzelunterschrift ernannt worden. BM Treuhand Murten AG (CH-217-0530776-9) ist nicht mehr Revisionsstelle. Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 29.11.2012 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.