Address
Chemin des Ecaravez 18
1092 Belmont-sur-Lausanne
Reports for Belnet SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Belnet SA
- Belnet SA has its legal headquarters in Belmont-sur-Lausanne and is active. It operates in the sector «Cleaning of buildings».
- Belnet SA was founded on 24.12.1987.
- On the 09.09.2022 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of VD is CHE-106.225.696.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
24.12.1987
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Belmont-sur-Lausanne
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.082.534-9
UID/VAT
CHE-106.225.696
Sector
Cleaning of buildings
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Travaux d'entretien, de réfection et de nettoyage de matériel et d'immeubles; activités relatives aux transports routiers, maritimes et aériens de personnes ou marchandises; exploitation d'établissements publics; commerce de biens meubles et exploitation de brevets, droits ou licences; activités commerciales et immobilières.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire CM Fidatel S.A. | Savigny | 26.03.2021 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Gilbert Jouvenat | Pully | 17.11.2020 | 30.11.2020 | |
Fiduciaire Favre Révision SA | Lausanne | 06.07.2018 | 10.11.2020 | |
Executive Solutions Sàrl | Auboranges | 17.03.2010 | 05.07.2018 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Belnet SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005558714, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Belnet SA, à Belmont-sur-Lausanne, CHE-106.225.696 (FOSC du 26.08.2022, p. 0/1005548837).
Nouvelle adresse:
Chemin des Ecaravez 18, 1092 Belmont-sur-Lausanne. Eggenberger Andreas n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée.
Publication number: HR02-1005548837, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Belnet SA, à Belmont-sur-Lausanne, CHE-106.225.696 (FOSC du 10.02.2022, p. 0/1005402735). Eggenberger Werner et Eggenberger Robin ne sont plus administrateurs;
leur signature est radiée.
Publication number: HR02-1005402735, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Belnet SA, à Belmont-sur-Lausanne, CHE-106.225.696 (FOSC du 17.05.2021, p. 0/1005183482). Eggenberger Andreas n'est plus président. Eggenberger Werner, de Grabs, à Lutry, président, avec signature individuelle, et Eggenberger Robin, de Grabs, à Lutry, avec signature collective à deux, sont membres du conseil d'administration.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.