Reports for Beau-Rivage Palace SA Lausanne-Ouchy
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Beau-Rivage Palace SA Lausanne-Ouchy
- Beau-Rivage Palace SA Lausanne-Ouchy from Lausanne operates in the sector «Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses» and is active.
- Beau-Rivage Palace SA Lausanne-Ouchy has 8 persons entered in its management.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 12.02.2024. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Beau-Rivage Palace SA Lausanne-Ouchy is the following: CHE-101.398.496.
Management (8)
newest board members
Jean-Gabriel Stéphane Louis François Pérès,
Onno Poortier,
Monika Elisabeth Matti von Däniken,
François Landolt
newest authorized signatories
John Léglise,
Sébastien Custot,
Benjamin Chemoul,
Jean-Gabriel Stéphane Louis François Pérès,
Onno Poortier
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
31.03.1883
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Lausanne
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.001.451-0
UID/VAT
CHE-101.398.496
Sector
Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Exploitation et extension de l'Hôtel Beau-Rivage Palace à Ouchy.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ofisa Berney Associés SA | Lausanne | 21.03.2007 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers SA | Pully | <2004 | 20.03.2007 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Beau-Rivage Palace SA Lausanne-Ouchy
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005958976, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Beau-Rivage Palace SA Lausanne-Ouchy, à Lausanne, CHE-101.398.496 (FOSC du 25.10.2023, p. 0/1005868939). La signature de Zambelli Andrea est radiée. Leglise John est nommé directeur général. Chemoul Benjamin et Hauser-da Cunha Victor Manuel signent collectivement à deux, désormais avec un administrateur, le directeur général ou Custot Sébastien. Signature collective à deux est conférée à Custot Sébastien, de Reinach (AG), à Oron.
Publication number: HR02-1005868939, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Beau-Rivage Palace SA Lausanne-Ouchy, à Lausanne, CHE-101.398.496 (FOSC du 26.01.2023, p. 0/1005662549). Lalatta Costerbosa Federico est maintenant à Milan (Italie).
Publication number: HR02-1005662549, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Beau-Rivage Palace SA Lausanne-Ouchy, à Lausanne, CHE-101.398.496 (FOSC du 22.07.2022, p. 0/1005527470). La signature de Seiler-Hayez Nathalie est radiée.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.