Reports for BBL Basler Baulabor AG, Muttenz
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout BBL Basler Baulabor AG, Muttenz
- BBL Basler Baulabor AG, Muttenz is currently active and the industry «Architectural and engineering activities». The legal headquarters are in Muttenz.
- The management of the company BBL Basler Baulabor AG, Muttenz, which was founded on the 21.12.2007, consists of 5 persons.
- On the 04.06.2024 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of BL is CHE-114.011.453.
- There are 8 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: Geocad + Partner AG, Jauslin + Stebler Group AG, Jauslin + Stebler Immobilien AG.
Management (5)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Arno Catrina,
André Renggli,
Jürg Poppel,
Martin Schäuble,
Fernand Deillon
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
21.12.2007
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Muttenz
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-270.3.014.012-2
UID/VAT
CHE-114.011.453
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Durchführung von Qualitätssicherungsmassnahmen aller Art im Bausektor und angrenzenden Gebieten, insbesondere Laboranalysen und -expertisen, Messungen in situ sowie Beratungen, vor allem in der Region Basel. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke sowie Lizenzen, Patente und andere Immaterialgüterrechte erwerben sowie Beteiligungen an anderen Unternehmungen halten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
RRT AG Treuhand und Revision | Chur | 04.06.2024 |
Former auditor (4)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Aarau | 18.05.2020 | 03.06.2024 | |
Testaris AG | Basel | 11.12.2018 | 17.05.2020 | |
Remaco Wirtschaftsprüfung AG | Basel | 17.07.2017 | 10.12.2018 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- fdm+e & Partner AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: BBL Basler Baulabor AG, Muttenz
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006047540, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
BBL Basler Baulabor AG, Muttenz, in Muttenz, CHE-114.011.453, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 128 vom 05.07.2023, Publ. 1005787296).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
BDO AG (CHE-345.012.024), in Aarau, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
RRT AG Treuhand und Revision (CHE-107.060.038), in Chur, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005787296, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
BBL Basler Baulabor AG, Muttenz, in Muttenz, CHE-114.011.453, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 229 vom 24.11.2020, Publ. 1005030296).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kündig, Daniel, von Rüschlikon, in Zürich, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Brenner, Karin, von Luzern, Weinfelden und Signau, in Möriken-Wildegg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Catrina, Arno, von Andeer, in Chur, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Poppel, Jürg, von Domat/Ems, in Chur, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Renggli, André, von Chur, in Chur, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005030296, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
BBL Basler Baulabor AG, Muttenz, in Muttenz, CHE-114.011.453, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 95 vom 18.05.2020, Publ. 1004891688).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kailides, Michael, von Lohnstorf, in Rheinfelden, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schäuble, Martin, von Basel, in Schönenbuch, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.