Reports for Barner AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Barner AG
- Barner AG with its legal headquarters in Schaffhausen is active. Barner AG operates in the sector «General structural engineering».
- Barner AG was founded on 28.03.1994.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 10.03.2022.
- The company is registered in the commercial register SH under the UID CHE-107.593.613.
- Companies with the same address as Barner AG: Barner Immo GmbH, Restaurant Fung Ze Yuan Man Wai Chuen.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.03.1994
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Schaffhausen
Commercial Registry Office
SH
Commercial register number
CH-290.3.003.429-4
UID/VAT
CHE-107.593.613
Sector
General structural engineering
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Durchführung und Planung auf dem Hochbausektor, das Ausarbeiten von Methoden und die Erschaffung von Hilfsmitteln im Bauwesen, Ausführen von grafischen Arbeiten, Handel mit dem Bauwesen nahestehenden Gütern.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Mäder + Baumgartner Treuhand AG | Neuhausen am Rheinfall | <2004 | 08.04.2015 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Barner-Oettli AG
- Oettli-Partner AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Barner AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005424091, Commercial Registry Office Schaffhausen, (290)
Barner AG, in Schaffhausen, CHE-107.593.613, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 137 vom 20.07.2015, S.0, Publ. 2278093).
Domizil neu:
Neustadt 73, 8200 Schaffhausen.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bernhard, Marion, von Rafz, in Dettighofen (DE), mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 2278093, Commercial Registry Office Schaffhausen, (290)
Barner AG, in Schaffhausen, CHE-107.593.613, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 67 vom 09.04.2015, Publ. 2086513).
Domizil neu:
Im Schweizersbild 9, 8200 Schaffhausen.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Weissenberger, Armin, von Deutschland, in Klettgau (DE), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bernhard, Marion, von Rafz, in Dettighofen (DE), mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 2086513, Commercial Registry Office Schaffhausen, (290)
Barner AG, in Schaffhausen, CHE-107.593.613, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 138 vom 20.07.2010, S. 15, Publ. 5734734).
Statutenänderung:
02.04.2015.
Aktien neu:
100 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00. [bisher: 100 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00].
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief oder Telefax an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen..
Vinkulierung neu:
Vinkulierung: Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Gemäss Erklärung vom 02.04.2015 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Mäder + Baumgartner Treuhand AG, in Neuhausen am Rheinfall, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.