Branches (3)
Reports for Barbey Génie Civil SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Barbey Génie Civil SA
- Barbey Génie Civil SA from Epalinges operates in the sector «General structural engineering» and is active.
- The company was founded on 21.12.1979.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 16.08.2024.
- The company Barbey Génie Civil SA is registered under the UID CHE-105.865.522.
- Companies with an identical address: EUROPEAN GOLF ASSOCIATION, Holdicast SA, Swiss Golf.
Management (4)
newest board members
Marin Freymond,
Nicolas Artibani,
Jean-Claude Knöpfli,
Yves Perrottet
newest authorized signatories
Marin Freymond,
Nicolas Artibani,
Jean-Claude Knöpfli,
Yves Perrottet
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
21.12.1979
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Epalinges
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.062.644-8
UID/VAT
CHE-105.865.522
Sector
General structural engineering
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Entreprise de construction en bâtiment et de génie civil.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PB Révision contrôle de gestion SA | Yverdon-les-Bains | 04.07.2024 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BfB Fidam révision SA | Renens (VD) | 06.12.2012 | 03.07.2024 | |
MGI Audit et Gestion SA | Monthey | 09.07.2007 | 05.12.2012 | |
Fiduciaire Soges SA | Lausanne | <2004 | 08.07.2007 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Roger Barbey génie civil S.A.
- Roger Barbey génie civil SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Barbey Génie Civil SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006108564, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Barbey Génie Civil SA, à Epalinges, CHE-105.865.522 (FOSC du 04.07.2024, p. 0/1006076156). Knöpfli Jean-Claude, maintenant à Le Mont-sur-Lausanne, et Perrottet Yves signent désormais collectivement à deux, pas entre eux. Artibani Nicolas, de Rougemont, à Bottens, et Freymond Marin, de et à Montanaire, sont membres du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR02-1006076156, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Barbey Génie Civil SA, à Epalinges, CHE-105.865.522 (FOSC du 01.05.2024, p. 0/1006022861). BfB Fidam révision SA (CH-550-0096433-4) n'est plus organe de révision.
Nouvel organe de révision:
PB Révision contrôle de gestion SA (CHE-101.787.277), à Yverdon-les-Bains.
Publication number: HR02-1006022861, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Barbey Génie Civil SA, à Epalinges, CHE-105.865.522 (FOSC du 23.12.2022, p. 0/1005637853). Inscription de la mention de l'existence d'une succursale à Vuarrens (CHE-282.750.663).
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.