Address
c/o room and living ag
Bühlmatthöhe 11
6045 Meggen
Reports for Banff Foundation
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Banff Foundation
- Banff Foundation from Meggen operates in the sector «Religious, political or secular associations» and is active.
- The management of the organization Banff Foundation consists of 10 persons. The foundation of the organization took place on 20.02.2013.
- On the 31.05.2023 the commercial register entry of the organization was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of LU is CHE-203.115.238.
- There are 2 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: room and dine ag, room and living ag.
Management (10)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Thomas Friedrich Müller,
Carmen-Gabriela Lefaucheur-Mocanu,
Roslyn Bernstein Mannon,
Dr. Michael Hartmann Mengel,
Cinthia Ivonne Drachenberg
newest authorized signatories
Thomas Friedrich Müller,
Carmen-Gabriela Lefaucheur-Mocanu,
Roslyn Bernstein Mannon,
Dr. Michael Hartmann Mengel,
Cinthia Ivonne Drachenberg
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
20.02.2013
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Meggen
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.7.795.942-4
UID/VAT
CHE-203.115.238
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Weltweite Förderung der kollaborativen Forschung und der Verbesserung des Wissens im Bereich der Transplantationspathologie und ähnlichen diagnostischen Methoden; Unterstützung von Forschungsprojekten der Banff Working Groups (BWG), deren Zweck es ist, die Sammlung und Auswertung der Daten für die evidenzbasierte Verfeinerung der Banff Klassifizierung voranzutreiben. Aufsichtsbehörde: (Die Stiftungsaufsicht wird zu einem späteren Zeitpunkt übernommen.).
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
ITERA Wirtschaftsprüfung AG | Aarau | 25.02.2013 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Banff Foundation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005756704, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Banff Foundation, in Meggen, CHE-203.115.238, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 16 vom 24.01.2023, Publ. 1005659912).
Domizil neu:
c/o room and living ag, Bühlmatthöhe 11, 6045 Meggen.
Publication number: HR02-1005659912, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Banff Foundation, in Meggen, CHE-203.115.238, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 51 vom 14.03.2022, Publ. 1005426066).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Mihatsch, Dr. Jörg Michael, genannt Michael, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Binningen, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Müller, Thomas Friedrich, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Erlenbach (ZH), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005426066, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Banff Foundation, in Meggen, CHE-203.115.238, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 4 vom 08.01.2020, Publ. 1004797853).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Glotz, Denis, französischer Staatsangehöriger, in Paris (FR), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Seròn Micas, Daniel, spanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Pallejà (ES), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lefaucheur-Mocanu, Carmen-Gabriela, französische Staatsangehörige, in Paris (FR), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Mannon, Roslyn Bernstein, amerikanische Staatsangehörige, in Omaha (US), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.