Reports for AV-Immoart SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout AV-Immoart SA
- AV-Immoart SA with its legal headquarters in Bouveret is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Connecting properties to local public utilities/infrastructure». AV-Immoart SA is active.
- AV-Immoart SA was founded on 10.02.2016.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 28.06.2018.
- In the commercial register the company AV-Immoart SA is registered under the UID CHE-462.745.364.
- On the same address as AV-Immoart SA there are 2 other active companies registered. These include: AV-Archi SA, MC Group Invest SA.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
10.02.2016
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Port-Valais
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-621.3.009.026-2
UID/VAT
CHE-462.745.364
Sector
Connecting properties to local public utilities/infrastructure
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Effectuer des opérations d'investissement, d'achat, de vente, de courtage, d'étude, de promotion, de gérance, de financement, de mises en valeur et de constructions immobilières, commerciales ou locatives, en Suisse et à l'étranger; réaliser tous plans, projets et plans financiers pour l'exécution de travaux de construction; exécuter ou faire exécuter et surveiller tous travaux de construction; importer, exporter et distribuer, tant pour son compte que pour le compte de tiers, des matériaux, des éléments de construction et des installations, y compris tous accessoires et objets annexes (cf statuts pour but complet).
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: AV-Immoart SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 4322547, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
AV-Immoart SA, à Port-Valais, CHE-462.745.364, société anonyme (No. FOSC 31 du 15.02.2016, Publ. 2667561).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Bovet, Jean-Pierre, de Rue, à Berne, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Cachat, Michel Charles, de Saint-Gingolph, à Port-Valais, administrateur unique, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: président, avec signature collective à deux].
Publication number: 2667561, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
AV-Immoart SA, à Port-Valais, CHE-462.745.364, Route Cantonale 36, 1897 Bouveret, société anonyme (nouvelle inscription).
Date des statuts:
05.02.2016.
But:
effectuer des opérations d'investissement, d'achat, de vente, de courtage, d'étude, de promotion, de gérance, de financement, de mises en valeur et de constructions immobilières, commerciales ou locatives, en Suisse et à l'étranger;
réaliser tous plans, projets et plans financiers pour l'exécution de travaux de construction;
exécuter ou faire exécuter et surveiller tous travaux de construction;
importer, exporter et distribuer, tant pour son compte que pour le compte de tiers, des matériaux, des éléments de construction et des installations, y compris tous accessoires et objets annexes (cf statuts pour but complet).
Capital-actions:
CHF 100'000.00.
Capital-actions libéré:
CHF 50'000.00.
Actions:
1'000 actions nominatives de CHF 100.00 avec restriction de transmissibilité selon statuts.
Organe de publication:
FOSC.
Communications aux actionnaires:
par avis inséré dans la FOSC ou lettre recommandée pour les convocations aux assemblées générales et par écrit ou courriel pour les autres communications. Selon déclaration du 05.02.2016, il est renoncé à un contrôle restreint.
Personne(s) inscrite(s):
Cachat, Michel Charles, de Saint-Gingolph, à Bouveret (Port-Valais), président, avec signature collective à deux;
Bovet, Jean-Pierre, de Rue, à Berne, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.