Reports for AFA Bus AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout AFA Bus AG
- AFA Bus AG with its legal headquarters in Adelboden is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Transportation of passenger and freight by road». AFA Bus AG is active.
- The management of the company AFA Bus AG consists of 9 persons.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 17.06.2024. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The company AFA Bus AG is registered under the UID CHE-108.094.749.
Management (9)
newest board members
Hanspeter Frautschi-Frieden,
Lothar Loretan,
Melanie Bütschi,
Mathias Germann,
Jerun Vils
newest authorized signatories
Martin Inniger,
Hans Schmid,
Priska Michèle Graf,
Hanspeter Frautschi-Frieden,
Lothar Loretan
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.01.1917
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Adelboden
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-092.3.000.344-6
UID/VAT
CHE-108.094.749
Sector
Transportation of passenger and freight by road
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck der Gesellschaft ist der Transport von Personen, Gepäck und Gütern und das Erbringen von Dienstleistungen aller Art im vorerwähnten Zusammenhang. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke erwerben, verwalten und veräussern sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Rüegsegger Treuhand AG | Frutigen | 27.12.2013 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Rüegsegger Treuhand | Frutigen | 12.08.2010 | 26.12.2013 | |
FIGAS Autogewerbe-Treuhand der Schweiz AG | Köniz | 29.02.2008 | 11.08.2010 | |
Genossenschaft FIGAS in Liquidation | Köniz | <2004 | 28.02.2008 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Automobilverkehr Frutigen-Adelboden AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: AFA Bus AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006058215, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
AFA Bus AG, in Adelboden, CHE-108.094.749, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 212 vom 01.11.2023, Publ. 1005873705).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Inniger, Martin, von Adelboden, in Adelboden, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005873705, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
AFA Bus AG, in Adelboden, CHE-108.094.749, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 124 vom 29.06.2023, Publ. 1005781241).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Graf, Paul, von Rebstein, in Oberdiessbach, Geschäftsführer, Sekretär (Nichtmitglied), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Bircher, Sandra, von Adelboden, in Frutigen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schmid, Hans, von Adelboden, in Achseten (Frutigen), Geschäftsführer, Sekretär (Nichtmitglied), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Graf, Priska Michèle, von Rebstein, in Oberdiessbach, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005781241, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Automobilverkehr Frutigen-Adelboden AG, in Adelboden, CHE-108.094.749, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 9 vom 13.01.2022, Publ. 1005379882).
Statutenänderung:
19.04.2023. 21.06.2023.
Abspaltung:
Ein Teil der Aktiven und Passiven geht gemäss Spaltungsplan vom 26.01.2023 auf die neu gegründete AFA Reisen AG, in Frutigen (CHE-149.218.658), über. Das Aktienkapital wird infolge Spaltung um CHF 540'000.00 herabgesetzt.
Firma neu:
AFA Bus AG.
Zweck neu:
Zweck der Gesellschaft ist der Transport von Personen, Gepäck und Gütern und das Erbringen von Dienstleistungen aller Art im vorerwähnten Zusammenhang. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke erwerben, verwalten und veräussern sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 360'000.00 [bisher: CHF 900'000.00].
Liberierung Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 360'000.00 [bisher: CHF 900'000.00].
Aktien neu:
9'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 40.00 [bisher: 160 Namenaktien zu CHF 200.00 und 868 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00].
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre: schriftlich oder mit elektronischer Post.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.