Reports for atelierkorak AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout atelierkorak AG
- atelierkorak AG has its legal headquarters in Riehen and is active. It operates in the sector «Photography, Operation of photo labs».
- The management of the company atelierkorak AG, which was founded on the 30.03.1983, consists of 2 persons.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 21.12.2023.
- The company's UID is CHE-108.119.036.
- There are 2 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: micaela's women / men GmbH, Musikzeit Musikschule Roman.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
30.03.1983
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Riehen
Commercial Registry Office
BS
Commercial register number
CH-270.3.003.697-2
UID/VAT
CHE-108.119.036
Sector
Photography, Operation of photo labs
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Betrieb eines Studios für visuelle und verbale Kommunikation zur Durchführung von Aufträgen auf dem Gebiet der Werbung sowie des Foto- und Filmwesens. Die Gesellschaft kann sich daneben an anderen Unternehmen irgendwelcher Art im In- und Ausland beteiligen, solche gründen, übernehmen und mit ihnen fusionieren. Sie kann Liegenschaften und Immaterialgüterrechte im In- und Ausland erwerben, belasten und veräussern sowie durch Beschluss des Verwaltungsrates Zweigniederlassungen und Agenturen im In- oder Ausland errichten.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
May-Treuhand AG | Muttenz | 15.02.2001 | 03.06.2020 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Korak Leu AG
- Eugen Leu & Partner AG
- Leu Eugen & Humbert Roger AG
- Leu Eugen & Partner AG
- Humbert, Leu + Vogt AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: atelierkorak AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005917138, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Korak Leu AG, in Riehen, CHE-108.119.036, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 250 vom 23.12.2020, Publ. 1005056348).
Statutenänderung:
07.12.2023.
Firma neu:
atelierkorak AG.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Betrieb eines Studios für visuelle und verbale Kommunikation zur Durchführung von Aufträgen auf dem Gebiet der Werbung sowie des Foto- und Filmwesens. Die Gesellschaft kann sich daneben an anderen Unternehmen irgendwelcher Art im In- und Ausland beteiligen, solche gründen, übernehmen und mit ihnen fusionieren. Sie kann Liegenschaften und Immaterialgüterrechte im In- und Ausland erwerben, belasten und veräussern sowie durch Beschluss des Verwaltungsrates Zweigniederlassungen und Agenturen im In- oder Ausland errichten.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen schriftlich, per E-Mail oder Fax an die im Aktienbuch eingetragenen Adressen.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Leu, Eugen, von Luzern, in Riehen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Korak, Thomas, von Buchs (SG), in Riehen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Korak, Annina, von Buchs (SG), in Riehen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005056348, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Eugen Leu & Partner AG, in Riehen, CHE-108.119.036, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 106 vom 04.06.2020, Publ. 1004902742).
Statutenänderung:
26.11.2020.
Firma neu:
Korak Leu AG.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Leu, Eugen, von Luzern, in Riehen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Korak, Thomas, von Buchs (SG), in Riehen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 5523564, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Eugen Leu & Partner AG, in Riehen, CH-270.3.003.697-2, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 32 vom 15.02.2001, S. 1162).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Humbert, Roger, von Basel, in Basel, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Leu, Eugen, von Luzern, in Riehen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident mit Einzelunterschrift].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.