Reports for AS Engineering AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout AS Engineering AG
- AS Engineering AG is currently active and the industry «Technical, physical and chemical testing». The legal headquarters are in Rüedisbach.
- The management has 2 active persons registered.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 29.01.2016. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The company's UID is CHE-101.931.456.
- SEW Solar Elektrizitätswerk Genossenschaft, Spezialitätenrösterei derkaffee GmbH are registered at the same address.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.02.2001
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Wynigen
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-035.3.028.506-6
UID/VAT
CHE-101.931.456
Sector
Technical, physical and chemical testing
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt Engineering, Herstellung, Installation und Betrieb von Energie- und elektronischen Systemen. Sie kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich bei anderen Unternehmungen im In- und Ausland beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmungen errichten oder erwerben sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die direkt oder indirekt mit diesem im Zusammenhang stehen. Sie kann im In- und Ausland Liegenschaften erwerben, veräussern, verwalten und vermieten.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
unico thun ag | Thun | <2004 | 13.11.2013 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: AS Engineering AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 2627587, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
AS Engineering AG, in Wynigen, CHE-101.931.456, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 221 vom 14.11.2013, Publ. 1179673).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schmutz, Dora, von Bösingen, in Bärau (Langnau im Emmental), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schürch, Christine, von Seeberg, in Rüedisbach (Wynigen), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 1179673, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
AS Engineering AG, in Wynigen, CH-035.3.028.506-6, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 249 vom 21.12.2012, Publ. 6987490). Gemäss Erklärung vom 24.10.2013 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
unico thun ag, in Thun, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 6987490, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
AS Engineering AG, in Signau, CH-035.3.028.506-6, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 254 vom 29.12.2010, S. 5, Publ. 5966156).
Statutenänderung:
14.12.2012.
Sitz neu:
Wynigen.
Domizil neu:
Dorf 8, 3474 Rüedisbach.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt Engineering, Herstellung, Installation und Betrieb von Energie- und elektronischen Systemen. Sie kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich bei anderen Unternehmungen im In- und Ausland beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmungen errichten oder erwerben sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die direkt oder indirekt mit diesem im Zusammenhang stehen. Sie kann im In- und Ausland Liegenschaften erwerben, veräussern, verwalten und vermieten.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre: schriftlich oder per E-Mail.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Sutter, Daniel, von Langnau im Emmental, in Rüedisbach (Wynigen), Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Signau];
Schürch, Christine, von Seeberg, in Rüedisbach (Wynigen), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Signau].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.