Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Reports for Amboss Rampe Immobilien AG
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
16.11.2016
Deletion from the commercial register
20.06.2023
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.043.950-8
UID/VAT
CHE-222.225.910
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Kauf, das Halten und Verwalten von Liegenschaften. Sie kann auch Liegenschaften verkaufen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
SRG Schweizerische Revisionsgesellschaft AG | Zürich | 21.11.2016 | 20.03.2018 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Amboss Rampe Immobilien Ltd
- Amboss Rampe Immobilien SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Amboss Rampe Immobilien AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR03-1005772517, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Amboss Rampe Immobilien AG, in Zürich, CHE-222.225.910, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 33 vom 16.02.2023, Publ. 1005679624). Aktiven und Passiven (Fremdkapital) gehen infolge Fusion auf die Amboss Rampe AG, in Zürich (CHE-483.108.140), über. Die Gesellschaft wird gelöscht.
Publication number: HR02-1005679624, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Amboss Rampe Immobilien AG, in Zürich, CHE-222.225.910, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 59 vom 25.03.2021, Publ. 1005132717).
Domizil neu:
Zollstrasse 80, 8005 Zürich.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Rutz, Thomas Dwight, von Zürich, in Freienbach, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Rutz, Gabriele, von Nesslau, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit Thomas Rutz.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stübi, Pascal Daniel, von Egg, in Zürich, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit Thomas Rutz];
Schreiber, Thomas, von Wädenswil, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit Thomas Rutz].
Publication number: HR02-1005132717, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Amboss Rampe Immobilien AG, in Zürich, CHE-222.225.910, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 68 vom 07.04.2020, Publ. 1004867264).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rutz, Thomas Dwight, von Zürich, in Freienbach, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Zürich].