Reports for Am Steuer nie! Schweiz
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Am Steuer nie! Schweiz
- Am Steuer nie! Schweiz is an Association with its legal headquarters in Zürich. Am Steuer nie! Schweiz belongs to the industry «Religious, political or secular associations» and is currently active.
- There are 8 active persons registered in the management.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 18.01.2024. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The organization Am Steuer nie! Schweiz is registered under the UID CHE-112.383.317.
- On the same address as Am Steuer nie! Schweiz there are 4 other active companies registered. These include: immo-zürich GmbH, MAEDER Renov + Care AG, physioUnterstrass Dalla Torre.
Management (8)
newest members of the committee
Christoph Jöhr,
Kristina Hildegard Keller,
Luzius Otto Dürr,
Tanja Wilke,
Urs Paul Ambauen
newest authorized signatories
Kristina Hildegard Keller,
Luzius Otto Dürr,
Chantal Bourloud Seeberger,
Esther Vogler
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
23.09.2022
Legal form
Association
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.6.003.089-5
UID/VAT
CHE-112.383.317
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Der Zweck des Vereins liegt darin, durch Präventionsmassnahmen einen Beitrag zur Verminderung von Verkehrsunfällen zu leisten. Der Verein bietet insbesondere Präventionsmassnahmen im Bereich von substanz-, müdigkeits- und ablenkungsbedingten Verkehrsunfällen an und unterstützt die Förderung der umfassenden Alkoholprävention im Strassenverkehr in der Schweiz.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Am Steuer nie! Schweiz
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005937296, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Am Steuer nie! Schweiz, in Zürich, CHE-112.383.317, Verein (SHAB Nr. 188 vom 28.09.2022, Publ. 1005570316).
Statutenänderung:
24.05.2023. [Die publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen haben keine Änderung erfahren.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Matthys, Peter, von Bern, in Bolligen, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Jöhr, Christoph, von Linden, in Ins, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR01-1005570316, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Am Steuer nie! Schweiz, in Zürich, CHE-112.383.317, Hotzestrasse 33, 8006 Zürich, Verein (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
21.05.1992. 19.05.2022.
Zweck:
Der Zweck des Vereins liegt darin, durch Präventionsmassnahmen einen Beitrag zur Verminderung von Verkehrsunfällen zu leisten. Der Verein bietet insbesondere Präventionsmassnahmen im Bereich von substanz-, müdigkeits- und ablenkungsbedingten Verkehrsunfällen an und unterstützt die Förderung der umfassenden Alkoholprävention im Strassenverkehr in der Schweiz.
Mittel:
Mittel: Mitgliederbeiträge;
freiwillige Beiträge von Mitgliedern;
Zuwendungen von Sponsoren;
Beiträge von staatlichen Einrichtungen, Institutionen, Stiftungen und Fonds;
Einnahmen für erbrachte Dienstleistungen und aus Materialverkäufen.
Eingetragene Personen:
Dürr, Luzius, von Zürich, in Zürich, Präsident des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Keller, Kristina, von Winterthur, in Zürich, Vizepräsidentin des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Matthys, Peter, von Bern, in Bolligen, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Wismer, Willy, von Winkel, in Winkel, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Ambauen, Urs, von Beckenried, in Volketswil, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Wilke, Tanja, von Meilen, in Meilen, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Bourloud Seeberger, Chantal, von Zürich, in Lindau, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Vogler, Esther, von Einsiedeln, in Baden, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.