Reports for Sonja Lovrinov-Juras
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator. Find out moreMandates
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Sonja Lovrinov-Juras
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006120046, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Nachtrag zum im SHAB Nr. 157 vom 15.08.2024 publizierten TR-Eintrag Nr. 35'180 vom 12.08.2024 iptiQ Group Holding AG, in Zürich, CHE-344.616.917, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 165 vom 27.08.2024, Publ. 1006114717).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Lovrinov-Juras, Sonja, von Neuenhof, in Baden, Sekretärin (Nichtmitglied), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005637272, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Intevis Holding AG, in Hünenberg, CHE-103.598.103, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 234 vom 01.12.2022, Publ. 1005617115).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Lovrinov-Juras, Sonja, von Neuenhof, in Baden, Zeichnungsberechtigte, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005430272, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Autonet Group Holding AG, in Cham, CHE-179.004.240, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 5 vom 08.01.2021, Publ. 1005068614).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Lovrinov-Juras, Sonja, von Neuenhof, in Baden, Zeichnungsberechtigte, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Broggi, Christian, von Turgi, in Dierikon, Zeichnungsberechtigter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.