Reports for Lukas Hunziker
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator. Find out moreMandates
Results for the name Lukas Hunziker
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Lukas Hunziker
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005911020, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
MICARO AG, in Freienbach, CHE-180.155.928, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 225 vom 18.11.2020, Publ. 1005025493).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hunziker, Lukas, von Gontenschwil, in Oberrieden, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Horgen].
Publication number: 3769793, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Baran Switzerland AG in Liquidation, in Baar, CHE-239.651.327, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 201 vom 16.10.2015, Publ. 2429773).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hunziker, Lukas, von Gontenschwil, in Horgen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 3669149, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
MICARO AG, in Freienbach, CHE-180.155.928, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 68 vom 06.04.2017, Publ. 3449741). Gemäss Erklärung vom 21.03.2017 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hässig, Erich, von Zürich, in Arni (AG), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hunziker, Lukas, von Gontenschwil, in Horgen, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift].