Ferdinand Zoller
domiciled in Zürich, from Au (SG) and Zürich Active mandates: Peter Steiner Holding AG, GZZ Immobilien AG and more Connected persons: Stefania Steiner, Hans-Peter Max Zürcher, Jürg Richard Gassmann and more You can stay up to date through "Ferdinand Zoller", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Ferdinand Zoller"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Ferdinand Zoller", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Ferdinand Zoller"
|
Places where people with the name Ferdinand Zoller live
Sectors in which people with the name Ferdinand Zoller work
Operation of other financial institutions
Connecting properties to local public utilities/infrastructure
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Operation of other financial institutions
Connecting properties to local public utilities/infrastructure
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Private persons with the name Ferdinand Zoller
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Ferdinand Zoller
Publication number: HR02-1005834747, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Peter Steiner Holding AG, in Zürich, CHE-101.785.663, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 141 vom 22.07.2022, Publ. 1005526723).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ryser, Christian, von Dürrenroth, in Wollerau, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Zoller, Ferdinand, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005834743, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Paradag AG, in Zürich, CHE-102.636.468, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 140 vom 21.07.2022, Publ. 1005525687).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ryser, Christian Martin, von Zürich, in Wollerau, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Zoller, Ferdinand, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 7109906, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Interfinco AG, in Opfikon, CH-400.3.008.231-1, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 96 vom 18.05.2012, Publ. 6683434).
Statutenänderung:
13.03.2013.
Sitz neu:
Zumikon.
Domizil neu:
c/o Dr. Jacob Zgraggen, Chapfstrasse 68, 8126 Zumikon.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schlatter, Virginia, von Hallau, in Opfikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Zoller, Ferdinand, von Zürich und Au SG, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.