Bettina Zahnd
domiciled in Winterthur, from Thurnen Active mandates: smartridr ag in Liquidation Connected persons: Severin Baer, Daniel-Serge Schläpfer, Andreas Peter Macaluso You can stay up to date through "Bettina Zahnd", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Bettina Zahnd"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Bettina Zahnd", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Bettina Zahnd"
|
|
Bettina Zahnd
domiciled in Steckborn, from Rüschegg and Steckborn Active mandates: bexund GmbH Connected persons: Daniel Erwin Zahnd You can stay up to date through "Bettina Zahnd", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Bettina Zahnd"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Bettina Zahnd", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Bettina Zahnd"
|
Places where people with the name Bettina Zahnd live
Sectors in which people with the name Bettina Zahnd work
Manufacturing of other products
Operation of general healthcare facilities
Manufacturing of other products
Operation of general healthcare facilities
Private persons with the name Bettina Zahnd
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Bettina Zahnd
Publication number: HR02-1004567276, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung für Prävention der AXA, in Winterthur, CHE-110.392.104, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 137 vom 18.07.2018, Publ. 4365973).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gujan, Mélanie, von Savigny, in Rüti ZH, Präsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Zahnd, Bettina, von Lohnstorf, in Winterthur, Präsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1004474297, Commercial Registry Office Zurich
smartridr ag, in Boppelsen, CHE-246.688.347, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 134 vom 13.07.2017, Publ. 3644051).
Statutenänderung:
05.10.2018.
Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 198'333.00 [bisher: CHF 133'333.00].
Liberierung Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 198'333.00 [bisher: CHF 133'333.00].
Aktien neu:
10'000'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 0.01 (Stimmrechtsaktien) und 4'916'650 Namenaktien zu CHF 0.02 [bisher: 10'000'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 0.01 (Stimmrechtsaktien) und 1'666'650 Namenaktien zu CHF 0.02]. Kapitalerhöhung aus genehmigtem Aktienkapital.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kuratli, Marc, von Küsnacht ZH, in Horgen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schläpfer, Daniel-Serge, von Herisau, in Boppelsen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, stellvertretender Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: stellvertretender Geschäftsführer, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Baer, Severin, von Hausen am Albis, in Oberrohrdorf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Zahnd, Bettina, von Lohnstorf, in Winterthur, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
de Geus, Alex Lodewijk, niederländischer Staatsangehöriger, in Muttenz, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Macaluso, Andreas Peter, von Horgen, in Horgen, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 1152801, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung für Prävention der AXA, in Winterthur, CH-020.7.903.562-9, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 165 vom 27.08.2012, Publ. 6822824).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Zahnd, Bettina, von Lohnstorf, in Winterthur, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Turicum Treuhand- und Steuerberatungsgesellschaft (CH-020.3.927.157-1), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Turicum Treuhand- und Steuerberatungsgesellschaft].