Beat Wydenkeller
domiciled in Bad Zurzach, from Burgdorf Active mandates: Atlogis GmbH Connected persons: Jürg Wydenkeller You can stay up to date through "Beat Wydenkeller", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Beat Wydenkeller"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Beat Wydenkeller", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Beat Wydenkeller"
|
|
Beat Wydenkeller
domiciled in Winterthur, from Winterthur Active mandates: Stiftung Pfadfinderheim Winterthur Connected persons: Nadine Friedmann, Andrea Lüond, Daniel Zwicky and more You can stay up to date through "Beat Wydenkeller", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Beat Wydenkeller"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Beat Wydenkeller", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Beat Wydenkeller"
|
Places where people with the name Beat Wydenkeller live
Sectors in which people with the name Beat Wydenkeller work
Warehousing and logistics
Religious, political or secular associations
Warehousing and logistics
Religious, political or secular associations
Private persons with the name Beat Wydenkeller
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Beat Wydenkeller
Publication number: HR02-1005413780, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Atlogis GmbH, in Bad Zurzach, CHE-114.258.870, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 76 vom 21.04.2008, S.1, Publ. 4438296).
Sitz neu:
Zurzach. [Gemeindefusion vom 01.01.2022].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wydenkeller, Beat, von Burgdorf, in Zurzach, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: in Bad Zurzach];
Wydenkeller, Jürg, von Burgdorf, in Zurzach, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Bad Zurzach].
Publication number: 7202240, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung Pfadfinderheim Winterthur, in Winterthur, CH-020.7.904.413-0, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 70 vom 12.04.2013, Publ. 7144776). [Gestrichene Angaben über die Organisation aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften gemäss Art. 95 HRegV.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Fraefel, René, von Winterthur, in Winterthur, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bosshart, Andreas, von Brütten, in Winterthur, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Lüond, Andrea, von Sattel, in Winterthur, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates und Aktuarin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Wydenkeller, Beat, von Winterthur, in Winterthur, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Stiftungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Zwicky, Daniel, von Winterthur und Glarus Nord, in Winterthur, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von Mollis, in Wiesendangen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates und Aktuar mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Henssler, Andrea, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Stahel, David, von Winterthur, in Winterthur, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: in Neftenbach];
Von Moos, Christian, von Winterthur, in Winterthur, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: 5006388, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung Pfadfinderheim Winterthur, in Winterthur, CH-020.7.904.413-0, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 244 vom 15.12.2006, S. 26, Publ. 3683030).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Senn, Christian, von Winterthur, in Zürich, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates und Kassier, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Moser, Stefan, von Winterthur, in Winterthur, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wydenkeller, Beat, von Winterthur, in Winterthur, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Zwicky, Daniel, von Winterthur und Mollis, in Wiesendangen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates und Aktuar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates und Protokollführer mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Stahel, David, von Winterthur, in Neftenbach, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates und Kassier, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].