Dr. Lorenzo Wullschleger
domiciled in Rovio, from Zofingen Active mandates: Uniconstructa SA in liq. Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Dr. Lorenzo Wullschleger", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Dr. Lorenzo Wullschleger"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Dr. Lorenzo Wullschleger", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Dr. Lorenzo Wullschleger"
|
Places where people with the name Lorenzo Wullschleger live
Sectors in which people with the name Lorenzo Wullschleger work
BranchCode_n/a
BranchCode_n/a
Private persons with the name Lorenzo Wullschleger
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Lorenzo Wullschleger
Publication number: 2883203, Commercial Registry Office Ticino, (501)
Associazione Providebit, in Arogno, CHE-110.084.312, associazione (FUSC no. 146 del 29.07.2011, Pubbl. 6277548).
Persone dimissionarie e firme cancellate:
Wullschleger, Dr. Lorenzo, da Zofingen, in Rovio, membro, senza diritto di firma.
Publication number: 2786801, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Taraconsult AG, in Zug, CHE-114.022.221, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 12 vom 18.01.2008, S. 18, Publ. 4296380).
Statutenänderung:
13.04.2016.
Domizil neu:
c/o Nützi Eisenring & Partner AG, Grabenstrasse 42, 6301 Zug.
Mitteilungen neu:
Sofern alle Aktionäre bekannt sind, erfolgen Mitteilungen mittels eingeschriebene Brief, ansonsten durch einmalige Publikation im SHAB. Mit Erklärung vom 07.04.2016 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet. [Änderung nicht publikationspflichtiger Tatsachen].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wullschleger, Dr. Lorenzo, von Zofingen, in Rovio, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Prosolve SA, Società fiduciaria di consulenza aziendale e revisione contabile (CH-514.3.014.778-7), in Paradiso, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Christmann, Thomas, von Zug, in Walchwil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 2667281, Commercial Registry Office Ticino, (501)
Fondazione Proedil, in Lugano, CHE-109.780.675, fondazione (FUSC no. 49 del 12.03.2013, Pubbl. 7100270).
Persone dimissionarie e firme cancellate:
Wullschleger, Lorenzo, da Zofingen, in Rovio, membro e segretario, con firma collettiva a due.
Nuove persone iscritte o modifiche:
Wullschleger, Nicola, da Zofingen, in Lugano, membro e segretario, con firma collettiva a due.