Josef Willimann
domiciled in Hohenrain, from Beromünster Active mandates: willimann.info Atelier für Brandschutz AG Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Josef Willimann", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Josef Willimann"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Josef Willimann", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Josef Willimann"
|
Places where people with the name Josef Willimann live
Sectors in which people with the name Josef Willimann work
Carpentry, roof construction and general timber work
Carpentry, roof construction and general timber work
Private persons with the name Josef Willimann
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Josef Willimann
Publication number: HR02-1005794619, Commercial Registry Office Nidwalden, (150)
Kayser Werke AG, in Oberdorf (NW), CHE-101.418.331, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 191 vom 01.10.2020, Publ. 1004989976).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Willimann, Josef, von Beromünster, in Hohenrain, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Pius Bienz Treuhand- und Revisions-AG (CHE-105.808.783), in Kriens, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kayser, Jost, von Stans, in Dallenwil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Wolfenschiessen];
Lufida Revisions AG (CHE-107.870.600), in Luzern, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005785679, Commercial Registry Office Nidwalden, (150)
Kayser Holzbau AG, in Oberdorf (NW), CHE-286.186.767, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 148 vom 03.08.2020, Publ. 1004950249).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Willimann, Josef, von Beromünster, in Hohenrain, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Pius Bienz Treuhand- und Revisions-AG (CHE-105.808.783), in Kriens, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lufida Revisions AG (CHE-107.870.600), in Luzern, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005275314, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Seco Beteiligungen GmbH, in Küsnacht (ZH), CHE-446.540.326, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 247 vom 21.12.2015, S.0, Publ. 2551539).
Firma neu:
Seco Beteiligungen GmbH in Liquidation. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Gesellschafterversammlung vom 15.07.2021 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Willimann, Josef Leo, von Schötz, in Ruswil, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift, [bisher: Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].