Elena Wiedenhofer Vena
domiciled in 5400 Baden, from Italy Active mandates: Caporaso AG Connected persons: Jürg Bloch, Max Bloch, Walter Caporaso and more You can stay up to date through "Elena Wiedenhofer Vena", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Elena Wiedenhofer Vena"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Elena Wiedenhofer Vena", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Elena Wiedenhofer Vena"
|
Places where people with the name Elena Wiedenhofer Vena live
Sectors in which people with the name Elena Wiedenhofer Vena work
Trading in food products
Trading in food products
Private persons with the name Elena Wiedenhofer Vena
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Elena Wiedenhofer Vena
Publication number: HR02-1005942966, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Caporaso AG, in Würenlingen, CHE-112.997.318, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 10 vom 14.01.2022, Publ. 1005381302). [Gemeindefusion vom 01.01.2024].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wiedenhofer Vena, Elena, italienische Staatsangehörige, in Baden, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Turgi].
Publication number: HR02-1005381302, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Caporaso AG, in Würenlingen, CHE-112.997.318, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 243 vom 16.12.2019, Publ. 1004784300).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Abbà, Dario, von Fislisbach, in Adligenswil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wiedenhofer Vena, Elena, italienische Staatsangehörige, in Turgi, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1004784300, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Caporaso AG, in Würenlingen, CHE-112.997.318, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 219 vom 12.11.2019, Publ. 1004757619).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Tolotos AG (CHE-108.174.029), in Wettingen, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Abbà, Dario, von Fislisbach, in Adligenswil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Wiedenhofer Vena, Elena, italienische Staatsangehörige, in Turgi, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
MeiTreu und Partner AG (CHE-115.211.902), in Eggenwil, Revisionsstelle.